EP3718996 - COMPOUND CONTAINING UNSATURATED DOUBLE BOND, OXYGEN ABSORBER COMPRISING SAME, AND RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGUCHI, Daiki c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2-28 Kurashiki-cho Tainai-shi Niigata 959-2691 / JP | 02 /
FUKUMOTO, Takashi c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2-28 Kurashiki-cho Tainai-shi Niigata 959-2691 / JP | 03 /
UJITA, Katsuji c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 1-3 Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8115 / JP | 04 /
KUBO, Keiji c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18882481.7 | 21.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018JP43061 | Priority number, date | JP20170231077 | 30.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017231077 | [2020/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019107252 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718996 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3718996 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/178, C08F20/26, C08F16/32, C07C69/54, B01D53/14, B01D53/02, B01J20/22, C07C43/15, C07C43/16, C07C43/215, C09D4/00, C08F222/10 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
C07C43/1785 (EP);
C07C43/178 (KR);
C08F16/32 (KR,US);
B01D53/14 (KR,US);
B01J20/22 (EP);
C07C43/15 (EP);
C07C43/16 (EP);
C07C43/215 (EP);
C07C69/54 (EP,KR);
C08F20/26 (KR,US);
C08F222/102 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP);
B01D2253/206 (EP);
B01D2257/104 (EP);
B01D2259/4591 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F222/102, C08F216/125 (EP);
C08F222/102, C08F220/40 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F222/102 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | C07C43/178, B01D53/14, C07C69/54, C08F16/32, C08F20/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG MIT UNGESÄTTIGTER DOPPELBINDUNG, SAUERSTOFFABSORBER DAMIT UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/41] | English: | COMPOUND CONTAINING UNSATURATED DOUBLE BOND, OXYGEN ABSORBER COMPRISING SAME, AND RESIN COMPOSITION | [2020/41] | French: | COMPOSÉ CONTENANT UNE LIAISON DOUBLE INSATURÉE, ABSORBEUR D'OXYGÈNE LE COMPRENANT ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2020 | Translation filed | 16.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA]WO2018039393 (KITTRICH CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1-4 * compound 2028;; table 1 *[A] 5-10 | International search | [XA]JPS59104338 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-4 * , table B (Family: none) * [A] 5-10; | [XA]JPH09188645 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1-4 * , claims (Family: none) * [A] 5-10; | [XA] - REGISTRY, (19850831), Database accession no. 93981-62-5, URL: STN [X] 1, 2,4 [A] 3, 5-10 | [A] - CONCEICAO, LUCINDA et al., "Supercritical CO2 as an effective medium for a novel conversion of glycerol and alcohols in the heterogeneous telomerisation of butadiene", Green Chemistry, (20120301), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1039/c2gc16149d, ISBN 1463-9262, pages 673 - 681, XP055616099 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2gc16149d | by applicant | US3644568 | JPS61101518 | JPS63130610 | JPH0578459 |