EP3717918 - INTERNET OF THINGS (IOT) ENABLED WIRELESS SENSOR SYSTEM ENABLING PROCESS CONTROL, PREDICTIVE MAINTENANCE OF ELECTRICAL DISTRIBUTION NETWORKS, LIQUID AND GAS PIPELINES AND MONITORING OF AIR POLLUTANTS INCLUDING NUCLEAR, CHEMICAL, AND BIOLOGICAL AGENTS USING ATTACHED AND/OR EMBEDDED PASSIVE ELECTROMAGNETIC SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Munoz, Michael 190 Candelero Dr. Apt 224 Crecent Beach Palmas Del Mar Humacao, Puerto Rico, 00791 / PR | [2024/10] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states Munoz, Michael P.O. Box 254 Dayton, MT 59915 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/10] |
Former [2020/41] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18882796.8 | 30.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018US63394 | Priority number, date | US201762592652P | 30.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762592652 P | US201762596492P | 08.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762596492 P | US201862624493P | 31.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862624493 P | US201862626247P | 05.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862626247 P | US201862655653P | 10.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862655653 P | US201862655643P | 10.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862655643 P | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019108986 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717918 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3717918 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01D21/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G01N29/11 (EP,KR,US);
G01N29/2481 (EP,KR,US);
G01D21/00 (EP,KR);
G01H11/08 (US);
G01N29/2462 (KR);
G16Y10/35 (US);
G16Y30/00 (US);
G16Y40/10 (US);
G16Y40/35 (US);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04Q9/00 (US);
H04W84/18 (US);
G01N2291/012 (EP,KR);
G01N2291/014 (EP,KR);
G01N2291/015 (EP,KR);
G01N2291/0215 (US);
G01N2291/02845 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2291/02863 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2291/02872 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2291/02881 (EP,KR,US);
G01N29/036 (US);
G01R15/144 (EP);
G01R15/146 (EP);
G01R31/088 (EP);
G01R31/327 (EP);
G01R31/50 (US);
G01R31/58 (EP);
G01R31/62 (EP);
G01R31/74 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP);
H10N39/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | G01R31/08, G06N20/00, H01L41/04, H01L41/23, H01L41/47, H01L27/20, G01D21/00, G01N29/11, G01N29/24, G01R15/14, G01R31/327 | ||
Former IPC [2020/41] | G01R31/02, G01R31/08, G06N20/00, H01L41/04, H01L41/23, H01L41/47 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERNET-DER-DINGE (IOT)-FÄHIGES DRAHTLOSES SENSORSYSTEM, DAS DIE PROZESSSTEUERUNG, DIE VORAUSSCHAUENDE WARTUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN VERTEILUNGSNETZEN, FLÜSSIGKEITS- UND GASROHRLEITUNGEN UND DIE ÜBERWACHUNG VON LUFTSCHADSTOFFEN EINSCHLIESSLICH NUKLEARER, CHEMISCHER UND BIOLOGISCHER STOFFE UNTER VERWENDUNG ANGESCHLOSSENER UND/ODER EINGEBETTETER PASSIVER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER SENSOREN ERMÖGLICHT | [2020/41] | English: | INTERNET OF THINGS (IOT) ENABLED WIRELESS SENSOR SYSTEM ENABLING PROCESS CONTROL, PREDICTIVE MAINTENANCE OF ELECTRICAL DISTRIBUTION NETWORKS, LIQUID AND GAS PIPELINES AND MONITORING OF AIR POLLUTANTS INCLUDING NUCLEAR, CHEMICAL, AND BIOLOGICAL AGENTS USING ATTACHED AND/OR EMBEDDED PASSIVE ELECTROMAGNETIC SENSORS | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CAPTEURS SANS FIL ACTIVÉ PAR L'INTERNET DES OBJETS (IDO) PERMETTANT UNE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS, UNE MAINTENANCE PRÉDICTIVE DE RÉSEAUX DE DISTRIBUTION ÉLECTRIQUE, DE CANALISATIONS DE LIQUIDE ET DE GAZ ET DE SURVEILLANCE DES POLLUANTS DE L'AIR COMPRENANT DES AGENTS NUCLÉAIRES, CHIMIQUES ET BIOLOGIQUES À L'AIDE DE CAPTEURS ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES PASSIFS FIXÉS ET/OU INTÉGRÉS | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 01.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005273218 (BREED DAVID S [US], et al); | [Y]CN205300803U (NINGBO POWER SUPPLY CO STATE GRID ZHEJIANG ELECTRIC POWER CO); | [XY]US2016261312 (FUCHS MITCHELL HARVEY [US], et al); | [Y]US2017123428 (LEVINSON JESSE SOL [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2001018847 (LYNAM NIALL R [US]); | [Y]US2005113964 (VAN DER MEULEN PETER [US]); | [A]US2006097335 (KIM DEOK-HOON [KR], et al); | [Y]US2007208390 (VON ARX JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [A]US2010199777 (HOOPER STEPHEN R [US], et al); | [A]US2011118753 (ITKOWITZ BRANDON [US], et al); | [Y]US2013043887 (ZIOLKOWSKI CHRISTOPHER JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US2015117157 (LI BODONG [SA], et al); | [Y]US2016048757 (NASLE ADIB [US], et al); | [A]US2016209454 (MCCAMMON PATRICK [US], et al); | [A]US2016261312 (FUCHS MITCHELL HARVEY [US], et al); | [Y]US2017011612 (JAIN PRABHAT [US]); | [Y]US2017045571 (JOSEPH BANGO [US], et al) |