EP3718545 - ANTITUMOR AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-27, Kandanishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8444 / JP | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Hiroyuki c/o Taiho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 3 Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | 02 /
HOSHINO, Takuya c/o Taiho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 3 Okubo Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18883950.0 | 28.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018JP43697 | Priority number, date | JP20170229681 | 29.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017229681 | [2020/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019107386 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718545 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4245, A61K45/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07D249/04, A61K45/06 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
C07D271/113 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4245 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/45 (RU);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07D249/12 (EP);
C07D271/06 (RU);
C07D271/07 (EP);
C07D413/06 (EP);
C07D413/10 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP);
C07D417/06 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP);
C07D491/107 (EP);
C07D498/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4245, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | A61K31/4245, A61K45/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07D249/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | 18.06.2020 | ME | 18.06.2020 | Validation states | KH | 18.06.2020 | MA | 18.06.2020 | MD | 18.06.2020 | TN | 18.06.2020 | Title | German: | ANTITUMORMITTEL | [2020/41] | English: | ANTITUMOR AGENT | [2020/41] | French: | AGENT ANTITUMORAL | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2020 | Translation filed | 18.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1988083 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-4,6-15* cl. 1 *; | [XPI]WO2017209155 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-4,6,9-11 * p. 4 ff.; cl. 19; examples 292, 129 * [I] 1-15 | International search | [A]WO2017111074 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* & EP 3395345 A1 & AU 2016379290 A & KR 10-2018-0095054 A & TW 201729811 A *; | [A]WO2017150725 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * & AU 2017226389 A & KR 10-2018-0118719 A & TW 201733590 A *; | [PXA]WO2017209155 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 12 * , claims 1-33 & CA 3025887 A1, claims 1-33 & TW 201800395 A * [PA] 1-11, 13-15 | by applicant | WO2011071565 | - Annu. Rev. Biochem., (19980000), vol. 67, pages 71 - 98 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19700000), vol. 245, pages 5228 - 5233 | - Nat. Commun., (20140000), vol. 5, page 3128 | - Clin. Sci., (20130000), vol. 124, pages 567 - 578 | - Expert. Opin. Ther. Targets, (20130000), vol. 17, pages 1423 - 1437 | - Biochem. Pharmacol., (20000000), vol. 59, pages 983 - 991 | - Biochem. Pharmacol., (20090000), vol. 78, pages 1178 - 11 85 | - Cancer Res., (19940000), vol. 54, pages 3686 - 3691 | - Pharmacol. Rev., (20050000), vol. 57, pages 547 - 583 | - Future Oncol., (20120000), vol. 8, pages 145 - 150 | - Biochem. Pharmacol., (20070000), vol. 73, pages 1548 - 1557 | - Tetrahedoron Lett., (20100000), vol. 51, pages 418 - 421 | - "Development of Pharmaceuticals", Molecular Design, Hirokawa Shoten, (19900000), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NM-001034 | - CANCER RESEARCH, (20040000), vol. 64, pages 1 - 6 | - Trends Pharmacol. Sci., (19830000), vol. 4, pages 450 - 454 | - Pharmacol. Rev., (20060000), vol. 58, no. 3, pages 621 - 681 | - Synergy, (20140000), vol. 1, pages 3 - 21 | JP20170229681 |