EP3719062 - PREPREG, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FIBER-REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Limited 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODA, Akimichi c/o Teijin Limited 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0005 / JP | 02 /
KUWAHARA, Hiroaki c/o Teijin Limited 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0005 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMOTO, Hironori c/o Teijin Limited 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/33] |
Former [2020/41] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18884706.5 | 28.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018JP43881 | Priority number, date | JP20170231939 | 01.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017231939 | JP20180056913 | 23.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018056913 | [2020/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019107457 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719062 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3719062 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08G59/50, C08J5/24 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
C08G59/5033 (EP);
C08G59/50 (US);
C08G59/504 (EP);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP);
C08J2363/00 (EP,US);
C08J2377/00 (US);
C08J2381/06 (US);
C08J2477/00 (EP);
C08J2481/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L77/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | C08J5/24, C08G59/50 | ||
Former IPC [2020/41] | C08J5/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PREPREG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PREPREG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FASERVERSTÄRKTEM VERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2020/41] | English: | PREPREG, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FIBER-REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2020/41] | French: | PRÉIMPRÉGNÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ PAR FIBRES | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2020 | Translation filed | 05.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2022 | Observations by third parties | 26.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24194320.8 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0493786 (TOHO RAYON KK [JP]); | [XI]US5169710 (QURESHI SHAHID P [US], et al); | [XI]US2013344305 (HATANAKA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al); | [XI]EP2947109 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2012046690 (TEIJIN TECHNO PRODUCTS LTD); | [A]JP2012528224 ; | [YA]JP2014141656 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [YA]JP2017501904 ; | [XYA]WO2017061502 (DAICEL-EVONIK LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPS60243113 | other | JP2014141656 | WO2015130368 | WO2017061502 | EP3360919 |