EP3722930 - OPERATION RECOGNITION APPARATUS, OPERATION RECOGNITION METHOD, AND SMART TERMINAL HAVING THE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Zhonglian Technologies Ltd., Co Room 30469, 14 Block, 251 Liantang Road Xinghuo Development Zone Fengxian District Shanghai 201419 / CN | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Guanghua Room 319 JiaoQiao Town Office Building Economic and Technological Development Zone Qingshanhu Nanchang Jiangxi 330008 / CN | 02 /
SONG, Gang Room 319 JiaoQiao Town Office Building Economic and Technological Development Zone Qingshanhu Nanchang Jiangxi 330008 / CN | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Ridderbusch, Oliver Prisma IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Straße 155, Haus 1 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Ridderbusch, Oliver Prisma IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Landshuter Allee 10 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18885208.1 | 24.10.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018CN111758 | Priority number, date | CN201711292251 | 08.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711292251 | CN201721696554U | 08.12.2017 Original published format: CN 201721696554 U | [2020/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019109750 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722930 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
G06F3/04166 (EP,US);
G06F3/0416 (KR);
G06F3/0445 (EP);
G06F3/0446 (EP);
G06F2203/04104 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/42] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | BETRIEBSERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BETRIEBSERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND INTELLIGENTES ENDGERÄT MIT DER VORRICHTUNG | [2020/42] | English: | OPERATION RECOGNITION APPARATUS, OPERATION RECOGNITION METHOD, AND SMART TERMINAL HAVING THE APPARATUS | [2020/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE RECONNAISSANCE D'OPÉRATION, PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE D'OPÉRATION, ET TERMINAL INTELLIGENT AYANT L'APPAREIL | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2020 | Translation filed | 08.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 22.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014198053 (YOON SANGSIC [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,8,12,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * [I] 2-5,7,9-11,14; | [XI]EP2972702 (TACTUAL LABS CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0044] * [I] 3,5,10; | [A]US4305135 (DAHL JEROME P, et al) [A] 5 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - line 42 * |