EP3721688 - UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE FOR USE NEAR HIGH VOLTAGE POWER LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quanta Associates, L.P. 2727 North Loop West Houston, TX 77008 / US | [2024/03] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Quanta Associates, L.P. 2800 Post Oak Blvd. Suite 2600 Houston, TX 77056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WABNEGGER, David, Karl 300-4333 Still Creek Drive Burnaby BC V5C 6S6 / CA | 02 /
O'CONNELL, Daniel, Neil 300-4333 Still Creek Drive Burnaby BC V5C 6S6 / CA | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [2024/08] |
Former [2020/42] | Williams Powell 11 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 18885393.1 | 07.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018US64440 | Priority number, date | CA20172988156 | 08.12.2017 Original published format: CA 2988156 | US201762596674P | 08.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762596674 P | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019113424 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721688 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3721688 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64U101/26, G01R31/08, B64C39/02 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
B64U20/30 (EP,US);
G01R31/085 (EP,US);
G05D1/0022 (US);
G05D1/101 (US);
H02G1/02 (US);
H05K9/0007 (US);
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
B64U2101/26 (EP,US);
B64U2101/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | H05K9/00, B64C39/02, B64D45/00, B64D47/00, B64C27/08, B64C27/20, G01R31/08 | ||
Former IPC [2020/42] | H05K9/00, B64C39/02, B64D45/00, B64D47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNBEMANNTES LUFTFAHRZEUG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER NÄHE VON HOCHSPANNUNGSSTROMLEITUNGEN | [2020/42] | English: | UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE FOR USE NEAR HIGH VOLTAGE POWER LINES | [2020/42] | French: | VÉHICULE AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ À PROXIMITÉ DE LIGNES ÉLECTRIQUES HAUTE TENSION | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 20.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US7797781 (PARK JOON YOUNG [KR], et al); | [XY]US2015314434 (BEVINS JR RICHARD C [US], et al); | [X]US2016200415 (COOPER ROBERT STANLEY [US]); | [A]US9421869 (ANANTHANARAYANAN PERUVEMBA RANGANATHAN SAI [US], et al); | [Y]US9488603 (STOCK CALVIN [CA]) | International search | [Y]US6781052 (HASENAUER CHARLES H [US]); | [Y]US7797781 (PARK JOON YOUNG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2016200415 (COOPER ROBERT STANLEY [US]); | [Y]US9421869 (ANANTHANARAYANAN PERUVEMBA RANGANATHAN SAI [US], et al); | [Y]US9488603 (STOCK CALVIN [CA]); | [Y]WO2017185106 (RHOMBUS SYSTEMS GROUP INC [US]) | by applicant | US4818990 | US7797781 | US2015314434 | US2016200415 | US9421869 | US9488603 | US10099561 |