Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11760485 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2023 | B2 | US2022281600 | 08.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217750910 | 23.05.2022 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | US201816213281 | 07.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11358717 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2022 | B2 | US2019176984 | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | US201816213281 | 07.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3084806 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2988156 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018380299B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2023 | B2 | AU2018380299 | 25.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3721688 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | B1 | EP3721688 | 04.08.2021 | A4 | EP3721688 | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO2020007007 | 19.06.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR20200253 | 22.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3721688T | 21.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2973651T | 21.06.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020005923 | 20.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12020550807 | 17.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US64440 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019113424 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2020001506 | 06.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3721688T | 09.04.2024 | T | Priority number | Date | US201762596674 | 08.12.2017 | CA2988156 | 08.12.2017 |