EP3689164 - ULTRASONIC ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Tobacco Hunan Industrial Co., Ltd. 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha, Hunan 410007 / CN | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jianfu 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 02 /
ZHONG, Kejun 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 03 /
GUO, Xiaoyi No. 386, Laodong Middle Road Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Wei 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 05 /
YU, Hong 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 06 /
DAI, Yuangang 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 07 /
YIN, Xinqiang 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 08 /
YI, Jianhua No. 386, Laodong Middle Road Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 09 /
ZHOU, Yongquan 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | 10 /
WANG, Yang 188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section Yuhua District Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Alpspitz IP Longinusstraße 1 81247 München / DE | [2024/15] |
Former [2020/32] | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18885953.2 | 07.12.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018CN119798 | Priority number, date | CN201721685711U | 07.12.2017 Original published format: CN 201721685711 U | [2020/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019110007 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689164 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3689164 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/05, A24F40/44 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
A24F40/05 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (US);
A24F40/44 (EP,KR,US);
B05B17/0607 (KR,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | A24F40/05 | ||
Former IPC [2020/32] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ULTRASCHALL-ZIGARETTE | [2020/32] | English: | ULTRASONIC ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2020/32] | French: | CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE ULTRASONORE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2020 | Translation filed | 28.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 14.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN204146335U (SHANGHAI TOBACCO GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0044] - [0051]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2015366267 (LIU QIUMING [CN]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0051] - [0057]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN206687168U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0045] - [0071]; figures 1-13 * |