EP3667343 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | VOLTAGE MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
[2024/11] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dong-Hyeon LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18887333.5 | 19.11.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018KR14210 | Priority number, date | KR20170172491 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170172491 | [2020/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019117487 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667343 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3667343 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/165, G01R31/3842, G01R31/396, H01M10/44, H01M50/204, H01M50/505, H02J7/00, H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H01M50/569, H01M50/51 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H01M10/4207 (EP);
G01R31/3835 (KR,US);
G01R19/16542 (EP,KR);
G01R19/16576 (KR);
G01R31/364 (KR);
G01R31/3842 (EP);
G01R31/389 (KR);
G01R31/396 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/425 (EP,KR);
H01M10/441 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M50/505 (EP,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,US);
H01M50/569 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (US);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | G01R31/36, G01R19/165, H01M10/42, H01M10/48, G01R31/3842, G01R31/396 | ||
Former IPC [2020/25] | G01R31/36, G01R19/165, H01M10/42, H01M10/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPANNUNGSMESSUNG | [2020/25] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING VOLTAGE | [2024/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE TENSION | [2020/25] |
Former [2020/25] | VOLTAGE MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND METHOD | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2020 | Translation filed | 10.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 24.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6313637 (IINO JUNICHI [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2005109600 (ARBARR ELECTRONICS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]EP2244350 (PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS POWER [JP]); | [A]US2012001640 (HASHIMOTO MASAHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2017150925 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [A]US2017315176 (YANAGAWA KENJI [JP]); | International search | [A]JP2009156845 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2011069639 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]KR20110056699 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP5638311B ; | [A]JP2017083303 (LAPIS SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | KR20170172491 |