EP3724565 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/43] | VACUUM ADIABATIC BODY AND REFRIGERATOR | ||
[2024/41] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07336 SEOUL / KR | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Hyeunsik IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Daewoong IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Bongjin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18888053.8 | 11.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018KR15710 | Priority number, date | KR20170171661 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170171661 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019117600 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724565 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/06, F25D23/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
F25D23/062 (EP);
F16L59/02 (RU);
F25D23/065 (KR,US);
F25D21/14 (KR,US);
F16L59/065 (KR,RU,US);
F25D11/00 (RU);
F25D23/00 (EP);
F25D23/028 (KR);
F25D23/06 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | F25D23/06, F25D23/02, F25D29/00, F25D17/06, F25D21/14, F16L59/02, F16L59/065 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | KÜHLSCHRANK | [2024/41] | English: | REFRIGERATOR | [2024/41] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2024/41] |
Former [2020/43] | ADIABATISCHER VAKUUMKÖRPER UND KÜHLSCHRANK | ||
Former [2020/43] | VACUUM ADIABATIC BODY AND REFRIGERATOR | ||
Former [2020/43] | CORPS ADIABATIQUE SOUS VIDE ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 07.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2589904 (LG ELECTRONICS [KR]); | [XYI]WO2017180126 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) | International search | [A]US2004035142 (YOON WON-JAE [KR], et al); | [Y]KR100725790B ; | [Y]US2007228907 (LUISI ARMANDO [IT], et al); | [Y]KR101631904B ; | [YA]KR20170016187 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]US2017336129 (CUNNINGHAM BRYAN STUART [CA]) | by applicant | JPH04327779 | KR20110006997 | EP2589904 | KR20170016187 | WO2017180126 | US2017336129 |