EP3726214 - IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIC TEST DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Medical Co., Ltd. 1-3, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZUMA Kanako c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 02 /
OKUYAMA Shinya c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 03 /
SAITO Kazunori c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 04 /
KOHNO Keigo c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 05 /
MORITA Motoki c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18888926.5 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018JP46022 | Priority number, date | JP20170240993 | 15.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017240993 | JP20170240994 | 15.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017240994 | [2020/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019117275 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726214 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/54388 (EP,US);
B01L3/5023 (US);
B01L2200/026 (US);
B01L2200/141 (US);
B01L2200/16 (US);
B01L2300/025 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAFISCHE TESTVORRICHTUNG | [2020/43] | English: | IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIC TEST DEVICE | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TEST IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIQUE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2020 | Translation filed | 07.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0306336 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [XI]US2013230845 (EGAN RICHARD L [US], et al); | [XI]US2017212108 (LI BING [US], et al) | International search | [XA]JPS6472066 (SYNTEX INC); | [X]JP2002022743 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [X]JP2008292197 (FUKAE KASEI KK, et al); | [XA]JP2009250763 (MITSUBISHI CHEM MEDIENCE CORP); | [XA]JP2012168051 (BESERU KK, et al); | [XA]JP2012198159 (AISIN SEIKI); | [X]JP2013238543 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [X]JP2014178153 (DENKA SEIKEN KK); | [X]WO2016084491 (MIZUHO MEDI CO LTD [JP]); | [X]JP2016161329 (DENKA SEIKEN KK); | [A]US2017212108 (LI BING [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2012168051 | JP2015535078 | JP2017173009 |