EP3724946 - COUPLED TRANSMISSION LINE RESONATE RF FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D Glass Solutions, Inc. 5601-B Balloon Fiesta Parkway NE Albuquerque, NM 87113 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEMMING, Jeb, H. 2719 Santa Monica SE Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US | 02 /
MCWETHY, Kyle 3911 Rancho Centro NW Albuquerque, NM 87120 / US | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [2024/16] |
Former [2020/43] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 18889385.3 | 13.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018US65520 | Priority number, date | US201762599504P | 15.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762599504 P | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019118761 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724946 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3724946 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/205, H03H1/00, H03H3/00, H01Q1/00, H01Q11/12, C03C15/00, C03C17/02, C03C17/06, H01P1/203 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H01P1/20336 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/15 (AU);
H01P11/003 (US);
C03C15/00 (EP);
C03C17/02 (EP);
C03C17/06 (EP);
C03C3/06 (AU);
C03C3/068 (AU);
C03C3/078 (AU);
C03C3/095 (AU);
C03C3/102 (AU);
C03C4/04 (AU);
H01H59/0009 (KR,US);
H01P1/2135 (KR,US);
C03C2201/10 (AU);
C03C2201/23 (AU);
C03C2201/30 (AU);
C03C2201/36 (AU);
C03C2201/40 (AU);
C03C2201/50 (AU);
C03C2201/54 (AU);
C03C2217/25 (EP);
C03C2217/254 (EP);
C03C2217/258 (EP);
C03C2217/261 (EP);
C03C2217/263 (EP);
C03C2218/115 (EP);
C03C2218/152 (EP);
C03C2218/31 (EP);
C03C2218/34 (EP);
C03C2218/345 (EP);
H01Q9/04 (AU);
H05K2201/017 (AU);
H05K2201/10098 (AU)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/43] | H01P1/205, H03H1/00, H03H3/00, H01Q1/00, H01Q11/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESONANTER RF-FILTER MIT GEKOPPELTEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNGEN | [2020/43] | English: | COUPLED TRANSMISSION LINE RESONATE RF FILTER | [2020/43] | French: | FILTRE RF RÉSONNANT DE LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION COUPLÉE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017098501 (FLEMMING JEB H [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0 10] , [0 23] - [0024] - [0026] - [0034]; figures 1, 4-6; claim - *; | [E]WO2019010045 (3D GLASS SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [E] 1-14* figure 15; claim - * | International search | [Y]US2014104284 (SHENOY RAVINDRA V [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-6,8-10, 15-19, 21-22, 24-25 * [0051], [0057], [0060]-[0083], Figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN105938928 (SKYWORKS SOLUTIONS INC) [Y] 1-25* Figures IE, 2A, 2B, 3A, 3B and related text *; | [Y]US2016380614 (ABBOTT BENJAMIN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * abstract, [0004], [0009], [0011], [0036]-[0037], Figures 1, 4, 11 *; | [Y]US2017098501 (FLEMMING JEB H [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * abstract, [0006]-[0008], [0010], [0016], [0023]-[0024], [0026]-[0034], Figures 1, 4A 4B, 5, 6, claim 1 * | by applicant | US9755305 | US9819991 | - TIAN et al., Semiconductor Microfabrication Processes |