|
10.07.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Description |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2024 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.09.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2022 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2021 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
124 |
|
20.06.2019 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
20.06.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
92 |