Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11857606 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2024 | B2 | US2021163546 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN201741045069 | 14.12.2017 | WO2018IN50837 | 13.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7465418B | Global Dossier | 11.04.2024 | B2 | JP2021506341 | 22.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | IN201741045069 | 14.12.2017 | WO2018IN50837 | 13.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111770687 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | IN201741045069 | 14.12.2017 | WO2018IN50837 | 13.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3085697 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN201741045069 | 14.12.2017 | WO2018IN50837 | 13.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3723488 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2021 | A4 | EP3723488 | 21.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN201741045069 | 14.12.2017 | WO2018IN50837 | 13.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020006191 | 06.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | IN201741045069 | 14.12.2017 | WO2018IN50837 | 13.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019116392 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN201741045069 | 14.12.2017 |