EP3753616 - PERSONALISED DOLL WITH FEATURES MATCHING AN IMAGE OF A REAL MODEL AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Desarrollos Avanzados Lookreal Concept 3D SL C/ Llebeig 12 Polígono Industrial La Marjal 03430 Onil / ES | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOUBERT NOGUEROLES, Felipe José c/ Llebeig 12-Poligono Industrial La Marjal 03430 Onil, Alicante / ES | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Serrano Irurzun, Javier C/ Edgar Neville, 3, 4ºD 28020 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Serrano Irurzun, Javier C/Infanta Mercedes 31, local 17 28020 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18890480.9 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/52] | WO2018ES70819 | Priority number, date | ES20170031429 | 19.12.2017 Original published format: ES 201731429 | [2020/52] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019122485 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | ES | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753616 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63H3/36 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
A63H9/00 (EP);
A63H3/365 (EP,ES)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | PERSONALISIERTE PUPPE ENTSPRECHEND EINEM BILD EINES REALEN MODELLS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2020/52] | English: | PERSONALISED DOLL WITH FEATURES MATCHING AN IMAGE OF A REAL MODEL AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2020/52] | French: | POUPÉE PERSONNALISÉE AYANT DES TRAITS DÉTERMINÉS SUR LA BASE D'UNE IMAGE D'UN MODÈLE RÉEL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LADITE POUPÉE | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2020 | Translation filed | 17.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 01.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016073719 (BARAD JILL E [US]) [A] 1-19 * , resumen de la base de datos WPI. Recuperado de EPOQUE; figuras 1 - 2. *; | [A]US6549819 (DANDURAN LARRY DALE [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * , resumen de la base de datos WPI. Recuperado de EPOQUE; figura 1; *; | [A]US4929213 (MORGAN RICHARD H [US]) [A] 1-19 * , resumen de la base de datos WPI. Recuperado de EPOQUE; figuras 1 - 5. *; | [A]US2015231516 (LAUER DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1-19 * , resumen de la base de datos WPI. Recuperado de EPOQUE; figura 25A-C. * | [X] - HPEspana, "Look Real | Imaginación y Realidad, juntas, con la tecnología HP Multi Jet Fusion", (20170910), YouTube, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=YRikd9b0vKA, XP054980812 [X] 1-19 | [X] - diversal, "Muñecas Look Real Dolls", (20171020), Youtube, URL: https://www.youtnbe.com/watch?v=ZzFCoznzOzE, XP054980811 [X] 1-19 |