EP3727837 - A REINFORCING LAYER, A CEMENTITIOUS BOARD, AND METHOD OF FORMING THE CEMENTITIOUS BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain ADFORS Canada, Ltd. 1795 Baseline Road Grand Island, NY 14072 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Nancy E. 51 Hilton Drive New Braintree, Massachusetts 01531 / US | 02 /
GOLDHAWK, Matthew S. 129 Ivyhurst Road Amherst, New York 14226 / US | 03 /
LI, Zhenpeng 100 Bethesda Place Pitney Flats, Tennessee 37686 / US | 04 /
ROSSELER, Olivier 20 Newbury Street Somverville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | [2020/49] |
Former [2020/44] | 01 /
BROWN, Nancy E. 51 Hilton Drive New Braintree, Massachusetts 01531 / US | ||
02 /
GOLDHAWK, Matthew S. 129 Ivyhurst Road Amherst, New York 14226 / US | |||
03 /
LI, Zhenpeng 100 Bethesda Place Pitney Flats, Tennessee 37686 / US | |||
04 /
ROSSELER, Olivier 64 Wyman Street Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18890567.3 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US66203 | Priority number, date | US201762607794P | 19.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762607794 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019126149 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727837 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/26, B32B5/02, B28B23/00, B32B13/12, B32B13/14, E04C2/06, E04C5/07 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B13/12 (EP);
B32B13/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B37/15 (US);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/026 (EP);
B32B5/028 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
E04C2/06 (EP);
E04C5/07 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/04 (EP);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/044 (EP);
B32B2262/0223 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/558 (EP);
B32B2307/714 (EP);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/734 (EP);
B32B2419/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | B32B5/26, B32B5/02, B28B23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKUNGSSCHICHT, ZEMENTPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZEMENTPLATTE | [2020/44] | English: | A REINFORCING LAYER, A CEMENTITIOUS BOARD, AND METHOD OF FORMING THE CEMENTITIOUS BOARD | [2020/44] | French: | COUCHE DE RENFORCEMENT, PLAQUE EN MATÉRIAU CIMENTAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE LA PLAQUE EN MATÉRIAU CIMENTAIRE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2004142618 (PORTER JOHN FREDERICK [CA]) | International search | [XY]US2002170648 (DINKEL JEFFREY [US]); | [A]US2005009428 (PORTER JOHN FREDERICK [CA], et al); | [A]US2005233656 (ROYER JOSEPH R [US], et al); | [A]WO2013155477 (SAINT GOBAIN ADFORS CANADA LTD [US]); | [Y]US2014242862 (PORTER JOHN F [CA]) |