EP3728869 - A SET OF PANELS, A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLY OF THE SAME AND A LOCKING DEVICE FOR A FURNITURE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2021/27] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERELÖV, Peter Lärkvägen 4 A 252 84 HELSINGBORG / SE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2023/04] |
Former [2020/44] | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | Application number, filing date | 18890665.5 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018SE51320 | Priority number, date | SE20170051640 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: SE 1751640 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125292 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728869 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3728869 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/20, F16B5/06, F16B21/08 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
F16B12/26 (EP,US);
A47B47/0075 (US);
F16B12/24 (EP,US);
A47B2230/06 (EP);
A47B47/0066 (EP,US);
A47B47/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENSATZ, VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DAVON UND VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN MÖBELPRODUKT | [2020/44] | English: | A SET OF PANELS, A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLY OF THE SAME AND A LOCKING DEVICE FOR A FURNITURE PRODUCT | [2020/44] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE PANNEAUX, LEUR PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR UN PRODUIT DE MOBILIER | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | ES | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | IT | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
IT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE734489 (GEORG BECKER, et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]GB794608 (ERICH HENSEL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2254289 (HEINZE FA R) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2300675 (LANG FRANZ JOSEF) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US3742807 (MANNING D) [A] 1-26* ; abstract; figures *; | [A]DD228872 (THUERINGER MOEBEL [DD]) [A] 1-26 * ; abstract; figures *; | [A]DE9417168U (SEELAND PETER [DE]) [A] 1-26 * ; figures; claims *; | [A]US2004165946 (AREH MARKO [SI], et al) [A] 1-26 * ; abstract; figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE202017101856U (HÄFELE BERLIN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-26 * ; abstract; figure 3 * |