EP3730571 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAKURA, Eiji c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Takuro c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMI, Atsushi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
IWATA, Ikuhiro c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 05 /
ITANO, Mitsushi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 06 /
KARUBE, Daisuke c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 07 /
YOTSUMOTO, Yuuki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 08 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuhiro c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 09 /
TAKAKUWA, Tatsuya c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 10 /
KOMATSU, Yuzo c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 11 /
OHKUBO, Shun c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18890744.8 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018JP46582 | Priority number, date | JP20170242183 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017242183 | JP20170242185 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017242185 | JP20170242187 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017242187 | JP20170242186 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017242186 | WO2018JP37483 | 05.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/JP2018/037483 | WO2018JP38746 | 17.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/JP2018/038746 | WO2018JP38749 | 17.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/JP2018/038749 | WO2018JP38748 | 17.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/JP2018/038748 | WO2018JP38747 | 17.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/JP2018/038747 | [2020/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019124380 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730571 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, F25B1/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F25B1/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10M131/04 (CN);
C10M171/02 (EP,CN,KR);
F24F1/0059 (US);
F24F1/0063 (EP,KR,US);
F24F1/0067 (EP,KR,US);
F24F1/14 (US);
F24F1/24 (EP,KR,US);
F24F1/32 (US);
F24F1/34 (US);
F24F1/38 (US);
F24F11/65 (EP,KR);
F24F11/88 (EP,KR,US);
F24F13/30 (EP,KR,US);
F24F3/052 (EP,KR,US);
F24F5/00 (EP,KR);
F24F5/001 (US);
F24H1/0018 (US);
F24H4/02 (EP,KR,US);
F25B1/04 (US);
F25B13/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B21/00 (US);
F25B29/00 (EP,KR);
F25B29/003 (US);
F25B31/002 (US);
F25B31/006 (US);
F25B31/026 (US);
F25B39/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B39/028 (US);
F25B41/00 (US);
F25B41/34 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/40 (CN);
F25B49/02 (EP,KR,US);
F25B49/022 (US);
F25B5/04 (EP,KR);
F25B7/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B9/002 (US);
F25B9/006 (US);
H02K1/22 (EP);
H02K1/27 (EP,KR);
H02K17/16 (EP,KR);
H02K9/08 (EP,KR);
C09K2205/106 (US);
C09K2205/122 (US);
C09K2205/126 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2205/128 (US);
C09K2205/22 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2205/24 (CN,US);
C09K2205/40 (EP,CN,KR);
C09K2205/43 (US);
C10M2211/022 (CN);
C10N2030/02 (CN);
C10N2040/30 (CN);
F25B2313/0233 (US);
F25B2400/07 (US);
F25B2400/121 (US);
F25B2500/05 (US);
F25B2500/07 (US);
F25B2600/05 (US);
F25B2600/2513 (US);
F25B2700/04 (US);
F25B2700/1931 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2020/44] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2020/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CYCLAGE DE FLUIDE FRIGORIGÈNE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2020 | Translation filed | 01.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2530915 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [I]US2016333243 (FUKUSHIMA MASATO [JP], et al); | [I]US2017002245 (FUKUSHIMA MASATO [JP]); | [I]US2017058173 (FUKUSHIMA MASATO [JP]); | [I]US2017058174 (FUKUSHIMA MASATO [JP], et al) | International search | [XY]WO2014203353 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * , * [Y] 1-29; | [Y]WO2015115252 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-29* , *; | [Y]WO2015141678 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-29 * , *; | [Y]WO2015186670 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-29 * , *; | [Y]WO2015186557 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-29 * , * | by applicant | JP2002054888 | US2015141678 |