EP3727638 - SCALE COLLECTION DEVICE FOR DOWNFLOW REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Zhanping 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Pengfei 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 03 /
BUNTING, Robert, L., Jr. 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18890814.9 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US66674 | Priority number, date | US201762609317P | 21.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762609317 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019126429 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727638 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/39, B01D29/44, B01D46/10 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
B01J8/006 (EP,US);
B01D24/12 (US);
B01D24/183 (EP);
B01J8/0085 (EP,US);
B01J8/0242 (EP,US);
B01J8/0278 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | KESSELSTEINSAMMELVORRICHTUNG FÜR ABSTROMREAKTOR | [2020/44] | English: | SCALE COLLECTION DEVICE FOR DOWNFLOW REACTORS | [2020/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE DE DÉPÔTS POUR RÉACTEURS À COURANT DESCENDANT | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 28.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014097125 (BAZER-BACHI FREDERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0037] , [0041] , [0046]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2918332 (MORTEN MÜLLER LTD APS [DK]) [A] 1-6* figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO2017080756 (IFP ENERGIES NOW [FR]) [A] 1-6 * figure - * | International search | [A]US4380529 (GUPTA RAMESH)[A] 1-20; | [A]CN103131472 (PETROCHINA CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-20; | [XA]WO2015136066 (MORTEN MÜLLER LTD APS [DK]) [X] 17-20 * , p. 2 lines 15-25, p. 14 line 4 - p. 15 line 32, fig. 2, abstract * [A] 1-16 | by applicant | US2014097125 | EP2918332 | WO2017080756 |