EP3729993 - BRUSH TIP FOR COSMETIC APPLICATOR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME AND COSMETIC APPLICATOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-23-37, Higashi-Ohi, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8537 / JP | [2023/52] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY, LIMITED 23-37, Higashi Ohi 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8537 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Hitoshi c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY, LIMITED, Gunma Factory, 1091, Tatsuishi Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375-8501 / JP | 02 /
SAKUMA, Satoshi c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY, LIMITED, Gunma Factory, 1091, Tatsuishi Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375-8501 / JP | 03 /
UMENO, Takashi c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY, LIMITED, Gunma Factory, 1091, Tatsuishi Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375-8501 / JP | 04 /
SATOU, Hiroshi c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY, LIMITED, Gunma Factory, 1091, Tatsuishi Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375-8501 / JP | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18890852.9 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018JP46792 | Priority number, date | JP20170243656 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017243656 | JP20180146957 | 03.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018146957 | [2020/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019124440 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729993 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A45D34/00, A46B9/02, A46B11/00, A46D1/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A46B9/021 (EP);
A46B9/065 (US);
A45D34/042 (US);
A45D40/20 (EP);
A46B11/0006 (EP);
A46D1/006 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | A45D34/04, A45D34/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | BÜRSTENSPITZE FÜR KOSMETIKAPPLIKATOR, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND KOSMETIKAPPLIKATOR DAMIT | [2020/44] | English: | BRUSH TIP FOR COSMETIC APPLICATOR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME AND COSMETIC APPLICATOR USING SAME | [2020/44] | French: | EMBOUT DE BROSSE POUR APPLICATEUR DE PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET APPLICATEUR DE PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE UTILISANT LEDIT EMBOUT | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2020 | Translation filed | 20.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 07.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2000041730 (PENTEL KK) [X] 1-3,5,8,10,12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0012]; figures 1,4 * [I] 4,7,9,16,17; | [XYI]JP2003010342 (PENTEL KK) [X] 3,6,8,10,13 * paragraph [0008]; figure 1; claim 2 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 4,7,9,16,17; | [Y]US2003035953 (WEIHRAUCH GEORG [DE]) [Y] 14,15* paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0033] , [0034]; figures 1-12 *; | [XY]US2008016637 (LIM BONG-TEAK [KR]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0028] - [0036]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 14,15 | International search | [YA]JP2005323953 (NAKAMURA KENJI, et al) [Y] 1, 5, 7-12, 16 * , paragraphs [0012]-[0017] & US 2005/0244440 A1, paragraphs [0016]-[0027] & US 2008/0302385 A1 * [A] 14; | [YA]JP3143336U (SEIWA CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-13, 15-17 * , paragraphs [0029], [0031], [0040], [0097]-[0098], fig. 1-10 (Family: none) * [A] 14; | [YA]JP2009285445 (FUJI CHEMICAL KK) [Y] 1-10, 13, 15- 17 * , paragraphs [0001], [0021][0023], [0031] & CN 101569465 A & CN 102669935 A & HK 1136172 A * [A] 14; | [Y]JP2010051593 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [Y] 9-10 * , paragraphs [0003], [0013], fig. 1-5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016529038 (L'OREAL) [Y] 11-12, 15-17* , paragraphs [0027]-[0035], fig. 8 & US 2015/0065927 A1, paragraphs [0036]-[0041], fig. 8 & WO 2015/031097 A1 & EP 3038494 A & CN 105517461 A & KR 10-2016-0048188 A & CN 108433333 A *; | [Y]WO2017110872 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [Y] 7-10 * , paragraph [0068] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH047181U | JPH0460482U | JPH08230385 | JP2014087637 | JP2016087289 |