EP3729519 - LED UNIT FOR DISPLAY AND DISPLAY APPARATUS HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd 65-16 Sandan-ro 163 beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAE, Jong Hyeon 97-11, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil, Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Chang Yeon 97-11, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil, Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | 03 /
JANG, Seong Gyu 97-11, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil, Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Ho Joon 97-11, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil, Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | 05 /
JANG, Jong Min 97-11, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil, Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | 06 /
CHO, Dae Sung 97-11, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil, Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18891199.4 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018KR16170 | Priority number, date | US201762608297P | 20.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762608297 P | US201862613333P | 03.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862613333 P | US201862614900P | 08.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862614900 P | US201862638797P | 05.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862638797 P | US201862683553P | 11.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862683553 P | US201862683564P | 11.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862683564 P | US201816198850 | 22.11.2018 Original published format: US201816198850 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019124952 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729519 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L33/38, // H01L33/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
H01L25/0756 (EP);
H01L33/08 (CN,KR,US);
H01L27/153 (CN);
H01L25/0753 (US);
H01L27/156 (KR);
H01L33/38 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L33/50 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | H01L33/08, H01L33/38, H01L27/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | LED-EINHEIT FÜR EINE ANZEIGE UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/44] | English: | LED UNIT FOR DISPLAY AND DISPLAY APPARATUS HAVING THE SAME | [2020/44] | French: | UNITÉ À DEL POUR AFFICHEUR ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE DISPOSANT DE CELLE-CI | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 19.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH0613655 (SHARP KK); | [I]JP2005072323 (OKI DATA KK, et al) | International search | [Y]KR20100016901 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2012195529 (UNIV YAMAGUCHI); | [A]JP2012209264 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD); | [A]KR101452801B (KWANGJU INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [XY]KR20170115142 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |