EP3729973 - SUCKING PARTICLE FOR HEAT-NOT-BURN CIGARETTE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG WONDERFUL INTERNATIONAL BIOTECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. South Orange Road Bodong Science Park Yangqiao Town Boluo County Huizhou, guangdong 516517 / CN | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAN, Jianbing Rm. 3-604-1, Yinhe Building No.2008, Xinluoda Street, Gaoxin District Jinan, Shandong 250101 / CN | 02 /
MA, Lei Rm. 3-604-1, Yinhe Building No.2008, Xinluoda Street, Gaoxin District Jinan, Shandong 250101 / CN | 03 /
ZHAN, Baoming Rm. 3-604-1, Yinhe Building No.2008, Xinluoda Street, Gaoxin District Jinan, Shandong 250101 / CN | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18891316.4 | 03.09.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018CN103849 | Priority number, date | CN201711361766 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711361766 | [2020/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019119874 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729973 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24B3/14, A24F47/00, A24B15/16, A24B15/18, A24B15/30, A24D1/20 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A24B3/14 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A24B15/16 (EP);
A24B15/18 (EP);
A24B15/28 (KR);
A24B15/30 (EP);
A24B15/302 (US);
A24B3/12 (US);
A24D1/20 (EP);
A24F40/20 (KR);
A24F40/70 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | A24B3/14, A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | SAUGPARTIKEL FÜR ZIGARETTE MIT HITZEERZEUGUNG OHNE VERBRENNUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/44] | English: | SUCKING PARTICLE FOR HEAT-NOT-BURN CIGARETTE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2020/44] | French: | PARTICULE D'ASPIRATION POUR CIGARETTE SANS COMBUSTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | Translation filed | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 29.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011155154 (ZHUANG SHUZHONG [US], et al) [I] 10 * the whole document *; | [IY]US2015040922 (DUBE MICHAEL FRANCIS [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * claims 1-3; paragraphs [0069] , [0074] , [0023] , [0078] * [Y] 8,9; | [Y]US2016050968 (WILLIAMS JONNIE R [US]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]US2017035115 (MONSEES JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 8,9* paragraph [0249] * |