EP3560965 - OLEFIN POLYMER, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND FILM USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IM, Seul Ki LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seungmi LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KWON, Ohjoo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Eunji LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Ki Soo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
HONG, Daesik LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
PARK, Sung Ho LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 08 /
YOU, Youngsuk LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 09 /
LEE, Jinyoung LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 18891719.9 | 29.11.2018 | [2019/44] | WO2018KR14973 | Priority number, date | KR20170174517 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170174517 | KR20180148557 | 27.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180148557 | [2019/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019124805 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560965 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F4/6592, C08J5/18 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F10/04 (US);
C08F10/02 (US);
C08F10/14 (US);
C08F4/6428 (KR);
C08F4/6465 (US);
C08F4/6491 (KR);
C08F4/65912 (EP,KR);
C08F4/65916 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/6592 (KR,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2410/01 (EP);
C08F2420/02 (EP);
C08F2420/10 (EP);
C08F2500/10 (KR,US);
C08F2500/12 (KR);
C08F2500/26 (KR);
C08J2323/04 (US);
C08J2323/06 (EP);
C08J2323/10 (US);
C08J2323/20 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/02, C08F4/65904 (EP);
C08F110/02, C08F4/65925, C08F4/6592 (EP);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/10, C08F2500/26, C08F2500/31 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | C08F2/38, C08F4/6592, C08F4/649, C08F4/659, C08F4/642, C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | OLEFINPOLYMER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND FILM DAMIT | [2019/44] | English: | OLEFIN POLYMER, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND FILM USING SAME | [2019/44] | French: | POLYMÈRE D'OLÉFINE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET FILM L'UTILISANT | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2019 | Translation filed | 23.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 21.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017081437 (LERNOUX ETIENNE R H [BE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,15 * example 7, reference examples 1,3, tables 2-3 *; | [A]EP3168243 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 8-14* comparative example 1 * | International search | WO2010034464 [a] (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [a] 1-15; | KR20110061584 [a] (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE]) [a] 1-15; | KR20110063488 [a] (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE]) [a] 1-15; | KR20110063489 [a] (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE])[a] 1-15; | KR20150063823 [a] (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [a] 1-15; | KR20160067508 [a] (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [a] 1-15 |