EP3727360 - NON-RACEMIC BETA-HYDROXYBUTYRATE COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS ENRICHED WITH S-ENANTIOMER AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axcess Global Sciences, LLC 2040 East Murray Holladay Road, Suite 102 Salt Lake City, Utah 84117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Axcess Global Sicences, LLC 2040 East Murray Holladay Road, Suite 102 Salt Lake City, Utah 84117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLET, Gary 7810 South Prospector Drive Salt Lake City, Utah 84121 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte OG Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 18891741.3 | 20.11.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US62096 | Priority number, date | US201762607578P | 19.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762607578 P | US201815936849 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US201815936849 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125693 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727360 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/047, A61K31/22, A61K45/06, A23L29/00, A23L33/10, A23L33/12, A61K31/19, A61P3/08 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A23L29/035 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/30 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K9/14 (US);
A61K9/20 (US);
A61K9/48 (US);
A61P3/08 (EP,US);
A23L33/155 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2250/182 (US);
A23V2250/192 (US);
A23V2250/1946 (US);
A23V2250/7106 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/186, A23V2250/1944, A23V2250/1946, A23V2250/7106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | A61K31/047, A61K31/22, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | NICHT-RACEMISCHE BETA-HYDROXYBUTYRAT-VERBINDUNGEN UND MIT S-ENANTIOMER ANGEREICHERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2020/44] | English: | NON-RACEMIC BETA-HYDROXYBUTYRATE COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS ENRICHED WITH S-ENANTIOMER AND METHODS OF USE | [2020/44] | French: | COMPOSÉS BÊTA-HYDROXYBUTYRATE NON RACÉMIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS ENRICHIES EN L'ÉNANTIOMÈRE S, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 10.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016123229 (UNIV YALE [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,12-14 * page 3, line 1 - line 29; claim - * [I] 3,6,9-11,15; | [A]US2017296501 (LOWERY RYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI] - RHO J M ET AL, "ACETOACETATE, ACETONE, AND DIBENZYLAMINE (A CONTAMINANT IN L-(+)-BETA-HYDROXYBUTYRATE) EXHIBIT DIRECT ANTICONVULSANT ACTIONS IN VIVO", EPILEPSIA, RAVEN PRESS LTD, NEW YORK , US, (20020401), vol. 43, no. 4, doi:10.1046/J.1528-1157.2002.47901.X, ISSN 0013-9580, pages 358 - 361, XP001100603 [X] 1,2,8,12-14 * the whole document * [I] 3-7,9-11,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1528-1157.2002.47901.x | [XI] - HACES M L ET AL, "Antioxidant capacity contributes to protection of ketone bodies against oxidative damage induced during hypoglycemic conditions", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 211, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.EXPNEUROL.2007.12.029, ISSN 0014-4886, (20080501), pages 85 - 96, (20080126), XP022633636 [X] 1,2,8,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 3-7,9-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.expneurol.2007.12.029 | International search | [A]US8642654 (CLARKE KIERAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-3, 19 * ; entire document *; | [X]WO2016123229 (UNIV YALE [US]) [X] 1-3, 19 * ; entire document, especially claims 1-2, claims 5-6, pg 2 line 30 - pg 3 line 5, pg 16 lines 31-34, pg 22 lines 20-27, pg 31 lines 29-34 *; | [A]US2017258745 (MILLET GARY [US]) [A] 1-3, 19* ; entire document *; | [A]US2017296501 (LOWERY RYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 19 * ; entire document * | by applicant | WO2016123229 | US2017296501 | - RHO et al., "Acetoacetate, acetone, and dibenzylamine (a contaminant in 1-(+)-beta-hydroxybutyrate) exhibit direct anticonvulsant actions in vivo", Epilepsia, (20020000), vol. 43, no. 4, doi:10.1046/j.1528-1157.2002.47901.x, pages 358 - 61, XP001100603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1528-1157.2002.47901.x | - HACES et al., "Antioxidant capacity contributes to protection of ketone bodies against oxidative damage induced during hypoglycemic conditions", Exp Neurol, (20080000), vol. 211, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.expneurol.2007.12.029, pages 85 - 96, XP022633636 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.expneurol.2007.12.029 |