EP3728712 - NOVEL YARN AND FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Healthtextiles I Sverige AB Timmermansgatan 2 802 66 Gävle / SE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Tomas Trödjevägen 49 805 96 Gävle / SE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18891826.2 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018SE51341 | Priority number, date | DK2017PA70956 | 19.12.2017 Original published format: DK PA201770956 | SE20180050317 | 21.03.2018 Original published format: SE 1850317 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125295 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728712 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/04, A41D31/30, D02G3/12, D02G3/44 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
D02G3/449 (EP,IL,KR,US);
D02G3/04 (EP,US);
A41D31/30 (EP,IL);
D02G3/12 (KR,US);
D03D15/217 (US);
D03D15/25 (KR);
D03D15/47 (US);
D03D15/533 (KR);
D10B2101/12 (US);
D10B2101/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
D10B2201/00 (EP,IL,KR);
D10B2201/02 (US);
D10B2201/24 (US);
D10B2401/022 (US);
D10B2401/063 (US);
D10B2401/10 (US);
D10B2401/13 (EP,IL,KR,US);
D10B2401/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
D10B2501/00 (KR);
D10B2501/04 (US);
D10B2503/00 (KR);
D10B2503/06 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES GARN UND GEWEBE | [2020/44] | English: | NOVEL YARN AND FABRIC | [2020/44] | French: | NOUVEAU FIL ET TISSU | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 14.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 13.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]TW201404961 (CHENG KOU-BIN [TW]) | International search | [A]US4342811 (LOPATIN GEORGE, et al); | [A]WO2008130099 (KIM JU-HWAN [KR]); | [A]CN102168332 (CHANGSHU HUABO WOOLEN TEXTILE CO LTD); | [A]US2012117708 (TRAPANI VINCENT [US]); | [A]WO2014193875 (CUPRON INC [US]) | by applicant | US5538783 | WO9842909 | WO03000979 | WO03105996 | WO2005083164 | TW201404961 | WO2017099658 |