EP3728923 - WEDGE THREADFORM HAVING CREST TO ROOT THREAD COMPOUND RELIEF AREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydril Company 2200 West Loop South, Suite 800 Houston, TX 77027 / US | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Ultra Premium Services, L.L.C. 10120 Houston Oaks Drive Houston, TX 77064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUAREZ, Alejandro 15331 Benson Landing Drive Cypress, TX 77429 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18891838.7 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US66835 | Priority number, date | US201762608945P | 21.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762608945 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019126522 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728923 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3728923 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16L15/06, E21B17/042, F16L21/00, F16L25/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
E21B17/042 (EP,US);
E21B19/16 (US);
F16L15/001 (EP);
F16L15/006 (US);
F16L15/06 (EP,US);
F16L15/08 (EP,US);
F16L58/182 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KEILGEWINDEFORM MIT GEWINDEVERBUNDENTLASTUNGSBEREICHEN ZWISCHEN KAMM UND GRUND | [2020/44] | English: | WEDGE THREADFORM HAVING CREST TO ROOT THREAD COMPOUND RELIEF AREAS | [2020/44] | French: | FORME DE FILETAGE DE COIN POSSÉDANT DES ZONES DE DÉCHARGE DE DÉGRIPPANT DES SOMMETS AUX FONDS | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 12.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2024
17.07.2024
ADMISSIBLE VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE 54 rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR Opponent's representative Mbacke, Mactar Vallourec Tubes DPI 12 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2024/34] | 30.07.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | LU | 20.12.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 18.10.2023 | |
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007176423 (REYNOLDS HARRIS A JR [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4600224 (BLOSE THOMAS L [US]); | [A]US2002074799 (WATTS JOHN D [US]); | [XY]US2006145480 (MALLIS DAVID L [US], et al); | [Y]US2012038147 (MALLIS DAVID LLEWELLYN [US], et al); | [A]US2017146160 (BANKER EDWARD O [US]) | Opposition | FR2308854 | US6578880 | US2007176423 | EP1629229 | US7717478 |