EP3729354 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USE IN AUTHENTICATING USERS TO ACCOUNTS IN CONNECTION WITH NETWORK TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard International Incorporated 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRBY, Aaron 2317 Kehrs Ridge Drive Chesterfield, MO 63005 / US | 02 /
BRYSON, Brandon Craig 839 Arbor Chase Drive Wildwood, MO 63021 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18892160.5 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US61184 | Priority number, date | US201715850216 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: US201715850216 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125667 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729354 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/38, G06Q20/10 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
G06Q20/4014 (EP,RU,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/405 (RU);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG VON BENUTZERN IN VERBINDUNG MIT NETZWERKTRANSAKTIONEN | [2020/44] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USE IN AUTHENTICATING USERS TO ACCOUNTS IN CONNECTION WITH NETWORK TRANSACTIONS | [2020/44] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS POUR AUTHENTIFIER DES UTILISATEURS POUR DES COMPTES EN RELATION AVEC DES TRANSACTIONS DE RÉSEAU | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 05.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015161608 (GILBERT CRAIG [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] ** paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * | International search | [A]US8660955 (LEDBETTER RICHARD HOWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * See claims 1-3,8 and figure 5. *; | [A]US2015039506 (GROARKE PETER J [IE], et al) [A] 1-18* See claims 1,4-5,7 and figures 2-3. *; | [Y]US2017046701 (HEY MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0020],[0033]-[0034], claims 1,10,16 and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20170121014 (KIM JIN YONG [KR]) [Y] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0046],[0054],[0074]-[0076], claims 1-6 and figures 1-3. *; | [A]KR20170122890 (HAREXINFOTECH INC [KR]) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0053]-[0055],[0058]-[0071], claims 1-2,4-8,13 and figures 1-2. * | by applicant | US2015161608 |