EP3730537 - SILICONE RESIN-COVERED SILICONE ELASTOMER PARTICLES, ORGANIC RESIN ADDITIVE, AND OTHER USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Toray Co., Ltd. 2-24, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1408617 / JP | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKITA, Mari 663-31 Miyazakicho, Chuo-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba, 260-0805 / JP | 02 /
TANIGUCHI, Hiroko 4-1-2-101 Masago Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba, 261-0011 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIZAWA, Takeshi 4-1-22 Jozai-Higashi Kisarazu-shi, Chiba, 292-0806 / JP | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18892948.3 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018JP46703 | Priority number, date | JP20170243392 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017243392 | [2020/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019124418 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730537 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/50, A61K8/891, A61Q1/12, C08J3/05, C08J7/04, C08L83/04, C08L83/14, C09D7/65, C09D183/04, C09D183/14, C09D201/00, C09D183/02 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
C08J3/126 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q1/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/08 (US);
C08G77/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,KR);
C08G77/38 (US);
C08G77/50 (EP,KR);
C08J3/05 (KR);
C08J3/24 (KR);
C08J7/0427 (US);
C08L83/04 (KR);
C08L83/06 (US);
C08L83/14 (EP,KR);
C09D183/02 (EP);
C09D183/04 (KR);
C09D183/06 (US);
C09D183/14 (KR,US);
C09D201/00 (EP,KR);
C09D7/65 (EP,KR);
C08J2383/04 (EP);
C08J2383/05 (US);
C08J2383/14 (US);
C08J2483/04 (EP);
C08L2312/08 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08K5/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | C08G77/50, A61K8/891, A61Q1/12, C08J3/05, C08J7/04, C08L83/04, C08L83/14, C09D7/65, C09D183/04, C09D183/14, C09D201/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | SILIKONHARZBESCHICHTETE SILIKONELASTOMERPARTIKEL, ORGANISCHES HARZADDITIV UND ANDERE VERWENDUNGEN | [2020/44] | English: | SILICONE RESIN-COVERED SILICONE ELASTOMER PARTICLES, ORGANIC RESIN ADDITIVE, AND OTHER USES | [2020/44] | French: | PARTICULES D'ÉLASTOMÈRE DE SILICONE RECOUVERTES DE RÉSINE DE SILICONE, ADDITIF DE RÉSINE ORGANIQUE ET AUTRES UTILISATIONS | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2020 | Translation filed | 25.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 22.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2216357 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [XI]WO2011002695 (DOW CORNING [US], et al); | [XI]FR2972350 (OREAL [FR]); | [E]EP3699235 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPH04348143 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE); | [Y]JPH08109262 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE); | [Y]JPH09208709 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE); | [Y]JPH1036219 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE); | [Y]JPH10175816 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE); | [Y]JP2010180335 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2011026469 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD); | [Y]JP2012517959 ; | [Y]WO2017142068 (WACKER ASAHIKASEI SILICONE CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2017191798 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2003226812 | WO2006098334 | JP2010132878 | JP2011102354 | JP2011105663 | JP2011168634 | JP2014122316 | WO2017191798 |