EP3732047 - NONPLANAR PATTERNED NANOSTRUCTURED SURFACE AND PRINTING METHODS FOR MAKING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, James 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
STENSVAD, Karl K. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
LENTZ, Daniel M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
METZLER, Thomas J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
DAVID, Moses M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Mathys & Squire Mathys & Squire Europe LLP Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18894873.1 | 26.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018IB60624 | Priority number, date | US201762612219P | 29.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762612219 P | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019130221 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732047 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/18, B41F17/00, B41K1/22, B41F3/26, B41K3/26, B41M1/00, B81C1/00 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
B41K3/26 (EP,US);
B41C1/003 (EP,US);
B41C1/184 (EP,US);
B41F17/22 (EP);
B81C1/00206 (EP,US);
B81B2207/056 (EP);
B81C2201/0185 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | NICHTPLANARE GEMUSTERTE NANOSTRUKTURIERTE OBERFLÄCHE UND DRUCKVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/45] | English: | NONPLANAR PATTERNED NANOSTRUCTURED SURFACE AND PRINTING METHODS FOR MAKING THEREOF | [2020/45] | French: | SURFACE NANOSTRUCTURÉE NON PLANE À MOTIF ET PROCÉDÉS D'IMPRESSION POUR PRODUIRE CETTE SURFACE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 14.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6518168 (CLEM PAUL G [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]EP0812434 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [X] 1,9 * claims 17-19 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] - [0024] - [0033] , [0034] , [0039] * [I] 11; | [A]US2015336379 (RATTRAY TYLER J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5900160 (WHITESIDES GEORGE M [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract, column 4 line 64-column 5 line 6, column 11 line 14-45, figures 5a-5c *; | [Y]US2014202612 (STENSVAD KARL K [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * entire document, in particular, paragraphs [0003], [0009], [0017]-[0021], [0047], [0048], fig u res 1-4 *; | [A]CN104360580 (UNIV BEIHANG) [A] 6, 11 * entire document, in particular, paragraph [0032], figure 3 of the original nonEnglish language document (a machine translation is enclosed only for your reference) *; | [XA]US2015101745 (RAMAKRISHNAN ED S [US], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0027], [0032], [0046], figures 3A, 6B, 7C * [A] 13-14; | [A]US2015343823 (PEKUROVSKY MIKHAIL L [US], et al) [A] * entire document, in particular, paragraph [0006], [0048] *; | [A]WO2016071760 (MYCRONIC MYDATA AB [SE]) [A] 15* entire document *; | [A]CN106444275 (SHENZHEN INST OF ADV TECH CAS) [A] * entire document, in particular, paragraph [0095], figures 4-5 of the original nonEnglish language document (a machine translation is enclosed only for your reference) * |