EP3733150 - DENTAL RESTORATIVE MATERIAL AND RESIN MATERIAL FOR DENTISTRY CUTTING FORMED OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 13.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Dental Corporation 38-9, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Takuya c/o Tokuyama Dental Corporation, 38-9, Taito 1- chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 02 /
KAZAMA, Hideki c/o Tokuyama Dental Corporation, 38-9, Taito 1- chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18895595.9 | 26.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018JP47916 | Priority number, date | JP20170249918 | 26.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017249918 | JP20180105970 | 01.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018105970 | [2020/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131788 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733150 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/893, C08G18/38, A61C13/087, C08K3/00, A61K6/17, A61K6/64, A61K6/71, A61K6/76, C08G18/32, C08G18/67, C08G18/76, C08K9/06, C08F290/14 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
C08G18/7621 (EP,US);
A61K6/893 (US);
A61K6/17 (EP,US);
A61K6/62 (US);
A61K6/64 (EP);
A61K6/71 (EP);
A61K6/76 (EP);
B29C39/003 (US);
B29C39/02 (US);
B29C39/38 (US);
C08F299/065 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/341 (US);
C08G18/348 (US);
C08G18/3876 (EP,US);
C08G18/675 (EP);
C08G18/7642 (EP,US);
C08G18/765 (EP);
C08K9/06 (EP);
A61C13/0022 (EP);
A61C13/087 (EP);
B29K2275/00 (US);
B29K2509/02 (US);
C08K2003/2227 (EP);
C08K2003/2241 (EP);
C08K2003/2244 (EP);
C08K2201/003 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/10 (EP);
A61K6/893, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08K9/06, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08K9/06, C08L75/16 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/45] | A61K6/09, A61C13/087, A61K6/027, C08K3/00, C08L75/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | ZAHNRESTAURATIONSMATERIAL UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTES HARZMATERIAL FÜR ZAHNMEDIZINISCHES SCHNEIDEN | [2020/45] | English: | DENTAL RESTORATIVE MATERIAL AND RESIN MATERIAL FOR DENTISTRY CUTTING FORMED OF SAME | [2020/45] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE RESTAURATION DENTAIRE ET MATÉRIAU À BASE DE RÉSINE ADAPTÉ AU FRAISAGE DE DENTISTERIE FORMÉ À PARTIR DE CE DERNIER | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2020 | Translation filed | 22.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 30.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4787850 (MICHL RUDOLF J [LI], et al); | [XAI]US5378737 (JACOBS RICHARD [US], et al); | [I]US2003166741 (KLARE MARTIN [DE], et al); | [IA]US2012021383 (SKARIA SUNNY [US], et al); | International search | [A]JPS5042696 (IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED) [A] 1-18* & US 4089763 A & US 4110184 A & GB 1465897 A & DE 2419887 A & FR 2226984 A *; | [Y]US4787850 (MICHL RUDOLF J [LI], et al) [Y] 3-7, 9-18 * , examples 1-9 & EP 195224 A2 *; | [Y]JP2002527588 (BUCHEL, T.) [Y] 2-7, 9-18 * , paragraphs [0011]-[0036], example 7 & US 7132459 B1, column 2, line 57 to column 5, line 54, example no. 7 & WO 2000/023493 A1 & EP 1129121 A1 & CN 1327456 A *; | [A]JP2012012333 (TOKUYAMA DENTAL CORP) [A] 1-18 * (Family: none) *; | [XY]US2015374590 (CHAN DANIEL C [US], et al) [X] 1, 8 * , claims, paragraphs [0022]-[0039], [0051]-[0075] & WO 2014/153413 A1 * [Y] 2-7, 9-18; | [Y] - KHAN, A. S. et al., "Preparation and characterization of a novel bioactive restorative composite based on covalently coupled polyurethane-nanohydroxyapatite fibres", Acta Biomaterialia, (20080503), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.actbio.2008.04.016, pages 1275 - 1287, XP023611090 [Y] 3-7, 9-18 * , 2. Materials and methods, ISSN: 1742-7061 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actbio.2008.04.016 | [Y] - MARTIM, G. C. et al., "Novel urethane-based polymer for dental applications with decreased monomer leaching", Materials Science and Engineering C, (20161115), vol. 72, doi:doi:10.1016/j.msec.2016.11.050, pages 192 - 201, XP029863373 [Y] 3-7, 9-18 * , 2. Experimental procedures, ISSN: 0928-4931 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msec.2016.11.050 | by applicant | US4787850 | JP2002527588 | JP2007191598 | JP2016013997 | JP2017048121 |