EP3552701 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ZINC FERRITE CATALYST AND ZINC FERRITE CATALYST MANUFACTURED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Jun Kyu LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KO, Dong Hyun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHA, Kyong Yong LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
HAN, Sang Jin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
HWANG, Sunhwan LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Seongmin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 18896727.7 | 19.12.2018 | [2019/42] | WO2018KR16201 | Priority number, date | KR20170179588 | 26.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170179588 | [2019/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019132392 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3552701 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/03, B01J37/00, B01J23/80, B01J35/00, C07C5/48, C07C11/167, B01J23/00, B01J37/08 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B01J23/005 (EP);
B01J37/031 (EP,KR);
B01J23/80 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/19 (KR);
B01J37/0018 (KR);
B01J37/03 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/42] | B01J37/03, B01J37/00, B01J23/80, B01J35/00, C07C5/48, C07C11/167 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZINKFERRITENKATALYSATORS UND SO HERGESTELLTER ZINKFERRITENKATALYSATOR | [2019/42] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ZINC FERRITE CATALYST AND ZINC FERRITE CATALYST MANUFACTURED THEREBY | [2019/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CATALYSEUR DE FERRITE DE ZINC ET CATALYSEUR DE FERRITE DE ZINC AINSI FABRIQUÉ | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2019 | Translation filed | 11.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 31.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2008140213 (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 10-13 * abstract * * page 7, lines 2-8 * * page 9, lines 5-19 * * page 11, lines 3-10 * * example -; claim - * [A] 1-9; | [XA]WO2009045002 (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 10-13 * abstract * * page 7, lines 8-22 * * page 8, lines 2-14 * * page 10, line 7 - page 12, line 23 * * example 2; claim - *[A] 1-9 | International search | KR100847206B [xa] (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR]) [x] 10-13 [a] 1-9; | KR100950373B [a] [a] 1-13* the whole document *; | KR20160053499 [a] (AJOU UNIV IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]) [a] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [xX] - J.A Toledo-Antonio, N Nava, M Martı́nez, X Bokhimi, "Correlation between the magnetism of non-stoichiometric zinc ferrites and their catalytic activity for oxidative dehydrogenation of 1-butene", Applied catalysis A: General, (2002), vol. 234, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0926-860X(02)00212-0, pages 137 - 144, XP004370582 [x] 10-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-860X(02)00212-0 | [xX] - CHANDRASHEKHAR A. LADOLE, "Preparation and characterization of spinel zinc ferrite ZnFe2O4", Int. J. Chem. Sci.:, (2012), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 1230 - 1234, XP055608812 [x] 10-12 * abstract * | by applicant | KR20170179588 |