EP3603404 - SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING BONE-IN LEG MEAT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SEPARATED MEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD. 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIDO, Koji c/o MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD. 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | 02 /
TOYODA, Naoki c/o MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD. 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | 03 /
SAKURAYAMA, Hiroyuki c/o MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD. 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | 04 /
KOIZUMI, Akira c/o MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD. 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | 05 /
AKABANE, Hajime c/o MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD. 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | 06 /
KATO, Moemi c/o MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD. 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | [2022/11] |
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
KIDO, Koji C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD., 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | ||
02 /
TOYODA, Naoki C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD., 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKURAYAMA, Hiroyuki C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD., 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | |||
04 /
KOIZUMI, Akira C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD., 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | |||
05 /
AKABANE, Hajime C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD., 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | |||
06 /
KATO, Moemi C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO., LTD., 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18896962.0 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP46692 | Priority number, date | JP20170247369 | 25.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017247369 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131363 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603404 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3603404 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A22C21/00, A22C17/00 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
A22C21/0076 (EP,US);
A22C21/0023 (KR,US);
A22C17/00 (EP);
A22C17/0006 (KR);
A22C17/004 (EP,KR,US);
A22C17/0093 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON KNOCHENHALTIGEM BEINFLEISCH UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ABGETRENNTEM FLEISCH | [2020/06] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING BONE-IN LEG MEAT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SEPARATED MEAT | [2020/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE VIANDE DE CUISSE NON DÉSOSSÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE VIANDE SÉPARÉE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2019 | Translation filed | 28.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2018 | AL | 16.03.2022 | AT | 16.03.2022 | CY | 16.03.2022 | CZ | 16.03.2022 | EE | 16.03.2022 | ES | 16.03.2022 | FI | 16.03.2022 | HR | 16.03.2022 | LT | 16.03.2022 | LV | 16.03.2022 | MC | 16.03.2022 | MK | 16.03.2022 | MT | 16.03.2022 | PL | 16.03.2022 | RO | 16.03.2022 | RS | 16.03.2022 | SE | 16.03.2022 | SI | 16.03.2022 | SK | 16.03.2022 | SM | 16.03.2022 | TR | 16.03.2022 | BG | 16.06.2022 | NO | 16.06.2022 | GR | 17.06.2022 | IS | 16.07.2022 | PT | 18.07.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.12.2018 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
TR | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 19.12.2018 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 19.12.2018 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.12.2018 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.03.2022 | |
NO | 16.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP2153727 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0155] * [A] 5-8 [Y] 2-4,10,11; | [Y]WO2011074966 (MAREL MEAT PROCESSING BV [NL], et al) [Y] 2-4,10,11 * abstract ** page 1, line 3 - page 115, line 3 * | International search | [YA]JPH03117451 (NORDISCHER MASCHINENBAU) [Y] 4, 11 * , page 3, upper right column, line 20 to lower right column, line 3, fig. 1 & US 5071388 A, column 3, line 58 to column 4, line 15, fig. 1 & EP 402647 A1 *[A] 1-3, 5-10; | [YA]JPH05236868 (NORDISCHER MASCHINENBAU) [Y] 4, 11 * , paragraphs [0007]-[0010], fig. 1 & EP 544094 A1 & DE 4138964 C1 * [A] 1-3, 5-10; | [XYA]WO2008136513 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1, 9-10 * , paragraphs [0114]-[0115], fig. 1 & EP 2153727 A1, paragraphs [0114]-[0115], fig. 1 * [Y] 2-4, 11 [A] 5-8; | [YA]WO2013136994 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [Y] 2-4 * , paragraph [0032], fig. 7 & US 2014/0376693 A1, paragraphs [0126]-[0127], fig. 7 & EP 2827134 A1, paragraphs [0046]-[0047], fig. 7 * [A] 1, 5-11 | by applicant | WO2009139031 | JP2013507101 |