EP3733639 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FATTY ACID POLYOXYETHYLENE METHYL ETHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lion Corporation 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOKO Akinori c/o LION CORPORATION, 3-7, Honjo 1-chome, Sumida- ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | 02 /
SATO Masahiro c/o LION CORPORATION, 3-7, Honjo 1-chome, Sumida- ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | 03 /
NIIKURA Fumiya c/o LION CORPORATION, 3-7, Honjo 1-chome, Sumida- ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18896969.5 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018JP47012 | Priority number, date | JP20170250992 | 27.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017250992 | [2020/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131442 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733639 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/29, C07C69/24, C07C69/58, B01J21/04, B01J21/10, B01J23/00, B01J23/02 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
B01J21/04 (EP);
C07C67/29 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/10 (EP,KR);
B01J23/002 (EP);
B01J23/02 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/29, C07C69/24 (EP);
C07C67/29, C07C69/58 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/45] | C07C67/29, B01J21/10, C07C69/24, C07C69/58, C07B61/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FETTSÄUREPOLYOXYETHYLENMETHYLETHER | [2020/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FATTY ACID POLYOXYETHYLENE METHYL ETHER | [2020/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE POLYOXYÉTHYLÈNEMÉTHYLÉTHER D'ACIDE GRAS | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2020 | Translation filed | 05.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 17.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/43] | 09.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5817844 (HAMA ITUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * examples 4,9,11 *; | [ID]WO2007113985 (LION CORP [JP], et al) [ID] 1-4 * paragraphs [0021] , [0024]; examples 1-7; claims 1,5 *; | [I]WO2008078768 (LION CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-4 * examples 1-17; claim 1 * | International search | [X]WO2007113985 (LION CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * , claims, paragraphs [0009], [0021], [0024], [0052]-[0076] & KR 10-2008-0106565 A *; | [X]WO2008078768 (LION CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * , claims 1-7, paragraphs [0013], [0015], [0020]-[0024] & MY 159968 A * | by applicant | WO2007113985 | JPH0615038B | JPH07227504 | JPH06198169 | JPH06182206 | JPH05170688 | JPH0271841 | JPH08268919 | JPH08169860 | JPH08169861 | JP20170250992 |