EP3733286 - NOBLE METAL-TRANSITION METAL COMPLEX CATALYST SUPPORTED ON CARBON-COATED SILICA-ALUMINA SUPPORT, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 03.10.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanwha Solutions Corporation 86, Cheonggyecheon-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04541 / KR | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jeong Kwon 301 50-8, Jinheung-ro Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 03461 / KR | 02 /
MYEONG, Wan Jae 908-201 19, Baeul 2-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34021 / KR | 03 /
YOOK, Sun Woo 202 26-6, Pangyo-ro 552beon-gil, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13515 / KR | 04 /
JEON, Bong Sik 1207-1402 725, Dongseo-daero Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34195 / KR | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18897026.3 | 26.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018KR16688 | Priority number, date | KR20170183355 | 29.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170183355 | [2020/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019132524 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733286 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/38, B01J21/18, B01J37/02, B01J35/00, B01J23/62, B01J23/89, B01J37/16, B01J37/08, C07C29/149, C07C31/27 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
B01J23/626 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/38 (KR);
C07C31/276 (KR,US);
B01J21/08 (KR);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J21/18 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/8906 (KR);
B01J27/20 (EP);
B01J35/19 (KR);
B01J37/0201 (KR);
B01J37/0205 (US);
B01J37/0207 (EP);
B01J37/0209 (EP);
B01J37/0213 (EP,US);
B01J37/0217 (EP);
B01J37/0219 (EP,US);
B01J37/0228 (US);
B01J37/0242 (US);
B01J37/08 (KR);
B01J37/084 (EP,US);
B01J37/086 (EP);
B01J37/088 (EP);
B01J37/16 (KR);
B01J37/18 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/149, C07C31/276 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | AUF KOHLENSTOFFBESCHICHTETEM SILICIUMDIOXID-ALUMINIUMOXID-TRÄGER GETRÄGERTER EDELMETALL-ÜBERGANGSMETALL-KOMPLEX-KATALYSATOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/45] | English: | NOBLE METAL-TRANSITION METAL COMPLEX CATALYST SUPPORTED ON CARBON-COATED SILICA-ALUMINA SUPPORT, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2020/45] | French: | CATALYSEUR COMPLEXE DE MÉTAL NOBLE ET DE MÉTAL DE TRANSITION SUR UN SUPPORT SILICE-ALUMINE REVÊTU DE CARBONE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2020 | Translation filed | 07.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 07.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2017107164 (CHOI YOUNG HEON [KR], et al); | International search | [Y]JP2015073960 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-16; | [A]WO2015156582 (LOTTE CHEMICAL CORP [KR])[A] 1-16; | [Y] - PHAM, H. N., "Carbon Overcoating of Supported Metal Catalysts for Improved Hydrothermal Stability", ACS Catal., (20150508), vol. 5, pages 4546 - 4555, XP055469085 [Y] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acscatal.5b00329 | [Y] - HARA, Y., "The drastic effect of platinum on carbon-supported ruthenium- tin catalysts used for hydrogenation reactions of carboxylic acids", Applied Catalysis A: General, (20030000), vol. 239, pages 181 - 195, XP004404465 [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-860X(02)00388-5 | [A] - STAKER, A. L. et al., "Carbon Coating for Improved Hydrothermal Stability of Silica Supports", B.A., ACS Chemistry, Gustavus Adolphus College, (20090000), pages 1 - 85, XP055624494 [A] 1-16 | [A] - ROLDAN, L. et al., "The formation of a hydrothermal carbon coating on graphite microfiber felts for using as structured acid catalyst", Carbon, (20120000), vol. 50, no. 3, pages 1363 - 1372, XP028343619 [A] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2011.11.008 | [A] - FUJIKAWA, T., "Aromatic hydrogenation of distillates over SiO2-Al2O3 supported noble metal catalysts", Applied Catalysis A: General, (20000000), vol. 192, no. 2, pages 253 - 261, XP004272161 [A] 1-16 * , * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-860X(99)00403-2 |