EP3686365 - WALL STRUCTURE USING BLOCKS AND FRAMES WITH WEDGE-TYPE COUPLING PART FORMED THEREIN AND METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING WALL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Park, Jea Hong 1-1101, 111 Sadang-ro 17-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 07002 / KR | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Pöhner Scharfenberger Inh. Patentanwalt Dr. Burkhard Scharfenberger Kaiserstraße 33 97070 Würzburg / DE | [2023/14] |
Former [2020/31] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Pöhner Scharfenberger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18897038.8 | 27.11.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018KR14665 | Priority number, date | KR20170184760 | 29.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170184760 | [2020/31] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019132264 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686365 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686365 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/08, E04B2/02 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
E04B2/08 (EP,KR,US);
E04B2/18 (US);
E04B2002/0204 (EP,KR);
E04B2002/0206 (US);
E04B2002/021 (EP);
E04B2002/0228 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WANDSTRUKTUR UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BLÖCKEN UND RAHMEN MIT EINEM DARIN GEBILDETEN KEILFÖRMIGEN KUPPLUNGSTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WAND DAMIT | [2020/31] | English: | WALL STRUCTURE USING BLOCKS AND FRAMES WITH WEDGE-TYPE COUPLING PART FORMED THEREIN AND METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING WALL USING SAME | [2020/31] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MUR UTILISANT DES BLOCS ET DES CADRES DANS LESQUELS EST FORMÉE UNE PARTIE DE COUPLAGE EN COIN, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION DE MUR L'UTILISANT | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2020 | Translation filed | 09.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 21.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | LU | 27.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1759377 (GRAVEL ARMAND) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]JPS5827414U (NN) [A] 1-15* figure - * | International search | [A]JP2005171648 (DAIEI DENSETSU KK) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0014] and figure 1. *; | [A]KR100646609B (CHEON IL ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0028[-[0038] and figure 2. *; | [A]KR100649984B (YOO YONG KWAN [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See page 5 and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20100081651 (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0019] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]JP2010196364 (KAJIMA CORP) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0091], [0095]-[0098], [0101]-[0102] andfigures 5-8. * | by applicant | KR101071364B |