Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11611074 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2023 | B2 | US2020388839 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR16147 | 18.12.2018 | KR20170179893 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7445692B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2024 | B2 | JP2022081638 | 31.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR16147 | 18.12.2018 | KR20170179893 | 26.12.2017 | JP2020535240 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7119093B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2022 | B2 | JP2021508658 | 11.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR16147 | 18.12.2018 | KR20170179893 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111771301B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2023 | B | CN111771301 | 13.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR16147 | 18.12.2018 | KR20170179893 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3734716 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2021 | A4 | EP3734716 | 04.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR16147 | 18.12.2018 | KR20170179893 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019132381 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170179893 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102010929B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2019 | B1 | KR20190078720 | 05.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170179893 | 26.12.2017 |