EP3733913 - AUSTENITE-BASED HEAT-RESISTANT ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UGAWA, Yusuke c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, 6- 1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
KOCHI, Norifumi c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, 6- 1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
IZAWA, Takahiro c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, 6- 1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18897323.4 | 27.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018JP48342 | Priority number, date | JP20170253350 | 28.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017253350 | [2020/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131954 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733913 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/48, C22C38/54, C23C8/18 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/54 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | AUSTENIT-BASIERTE HITZEBESTÄNDIGE LEGIERUNG | [2020/45] | English: | AUSTENITE-BASED HEAT-RESISTANT ALLOY | [2020/45] | French: | ALLIAGE RÉSISTANT À LA CHALEUR À BASE D'AUSTÉNITE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2020 | Translation filed | 24.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 19.03.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10140296 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 1-4 * , *; | [X]CN103774056 (UNIV JIANGSU, et al) [X] 1-4 * , *; | [A]WO2017119415 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * , & EP 3401415 Al, Claims, [0093], Tablel & CN 108474072 A *; | [A]JPH07331390 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-4 * , *; | [A]WO2016104417 (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * , *; | [A]JPH09243284 (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1-4 * , * | by applicant | JP2001040443 | WO2017119415 |