EP3736134 - METHOD FOR BONDING SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/46] | METHOD FOR BONDING SUBSTRATE, TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE LAMINATE, AND DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SUBSTRATE LAMINATE | ||
[2024/41] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iSABers Japan Co. Ltd. Nittochi-Nishi-Shinjuku-Building 8F, 6-10-1, Nishi-shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | For all designated states Suga, Tadatomo 3-6-3, Higashinakano Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0003 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2024/36] | For all designated states iSABers Japan Co. Ltd. Nittochi-Nishi-Shinjuku-Building 8F, 6-10-1, Nishi-shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Suga, Tadatomo 3-6-3, Higashinakano Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0003 / JP | |||
Former [2020/46] | For all designated states Lan Technical Service Co., Ltd. 26-2-32F, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0532 / JP | ||
For all designated states Suga, Tadatomo 3-6-3, Higashinakano Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Yoshiie 26-2-32F, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0532 / JP | 02 /
SUGA, Tadatomo 6-3, Higashinakano 3-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0003 / JP | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/46] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18897427.3 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/46] | WO2018JP47204 | Priority number, date | JP20170254137 | 28.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017254137 | [2020/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131490 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736134 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/10, C03C17/23, C23C14/00, B29C59/14 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
B32B38/0008 (EP,US);
B32B37/26 (KR);
C03C27/10 (EP,KR,US);
B29C59/14 (EP);
B32B17/06 (KR,US);
B32B17/10 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/281 (EP);
B32B27/325 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B37/24 (EP,US);
B32B38/0036 (US);
B32B7/12 (EP);
C03C17/23 (EP);
C03C17/245 (EP,US);
C03C27/042 (KR);
C03C27/06 (KR);
C23C14/0036 (EP);
C23C14/022 (EP);
C23C14/042 (EP);
C23C14/08 (KR);
C23C14/081 (EP);
C23C14/46 (KR,US);
C23C14/56 (EP);
C23C14/5833 (EP);
C23C16/455 (KR);
H01L24/83 (US);
H05B33/02 (KR);
H05B33/04 (KR);
H10K50/00 (KR);
H10K71/50 (EP);
H10K77/10 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/8223 (EP);
B29C66/00141 (EP);
B29C66/00143 (EP);
B29C66/00145 (EP);
B29C66/0242 (EP);
B29C66/028 (EP);
B29C66/034 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/45 (EP);
B29C66/5326 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/73366 (EP);
B29C66/7465 (EP);
B29C66/83241 (EP);
B29C66/919 (EP);
B29C66/929 (EP);
B29C66/949 (EP);
B32B2037/246 (US);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/20 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B2309/68 (EP);
B32B2310/0875 (US);
B32B2311/00 (US);
B32B2315/08 (US);
B32B2419/00 (EP);
B32B2457/12 (EP);
B32B2457/206 (EP);
C03C2217/214 (US);
C03C2218/152 (US);
C03C2218/1525 (EP);
C03C2218/154 (EP,US);
C03C2218/32 (US);
C23C16/45525 (US);
H01L2224/83048 (US);
H01L2224/8309 (US);
H01L2224/83948 (US);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2079/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/37] | B32B37/26, B29C65/02, B32B9/00, C03C27/10, C23C14/08, C23C14/46, C23C16/455, H01L51/50, H05B33/04, H05B33/10, B32B38/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/46] | B32B37/26, B29C65/02, B32B9/00, C03C27/10, C23C14/08, C23C14/46, C23C16/455, H01L51/50, H05B33/04, H05B33/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERKLEBEN EINES SUBSTRATS | [2024/41] | English: | METHOD FOR BONDING SUBSTRATE | [2024/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LIER UN SUBSTRAT | [2024/41] |
Former [2020/46] | VERFAHREN ZUM VERKLEBEN EINES SUBSTRATS, TRANSPARENTES SUBSTRATLAMINAT UND VORRICHTUNG MIT SUBSTRATLAMINAT | ||
Former [2020/46] | METHOD FOR BONDING SUBSTRATE, TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE LAMINATE, AND DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SUBSTRATE LAMINATE | ||
Former [2020/46] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LIER UN SUBSTRAT, STRATIFIÉ DE SUBSTRATS TRANSPARENT, ET DISPOSITIF COMPORTANT UN STRATIFIÉ DE SUBSTRATS | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2020 | Translation filed | 28.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2020 | Observations by third parties | 28.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 07.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2014123514 (RAN TECHNICAL SERVICE KK, et al); | [XI]US2015086794 (AKITA YOSUKE [JP], et al); | [XA]US2015171365 (SUGA TADATOMO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2004337927 (SUGA TADATOMO, et al); | [A]JP2008207221 (SHIMAZU TAKEHITO, et al); | [A]JP2009199902 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]WO2013154107 (SUGA TADATOMO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2013187500 (SUGA TADATOMO [JP], et al); | [XY]JP2014123514 (RAN TECHNICAL SERVICE KK, et al); | [XY]JP2015111596 (SUGA TADATOMO, et al); | [Y]JP2015111659 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2015207615 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2017157611 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) |