EP3733092 - HANDLE ASSEMBLY AND ANASTOMAT COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Touchstone International Medical Science Co., Ltd. 278 Dongping Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Zhi 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Yi 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Jiang 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 04 /
XU, Xiaowei 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18897799.5 | 29.11.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018CN118111 | Priority number, date | CN201721849649U | 26.12.2017 Original published format: CN 201721849649 U | [2020/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019128607 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733092 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (KR,RU);
A61B17/1114 (KR,RU);
A61B17/326 (KR,RU,US);
A61B2017/00367 (US);
A61B2017/0042 (KR);
A61B2017/00464 (KR);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07271 (US);
A61B2017/07285 (US);
A61B2017/1132 (KR);
A61B2017/1135 (KR);
A61B2017/2946 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | GRIFFANORDNUNG UND ANASTOMAT DAMIT | [2020/45] | English: | HANDLE ASSEMBLY AND ANASTOMAT COMPRISING SAME | [2020/45] | French: | ENSEMBLE POIGNÉE ET DISPOSITIF D'ANASTOMOSE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | Translation filed | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |