EP3733601 - ACTIVATED CARBON AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITATOMI, Hiroaki c/o KURARAY CO., LTD., 4342, Tsurumi Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | 02 /
NISHITA, Mitsunori c/o KURARAY CO., LTD., 4342, Tsurumi Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | 03 /
HITOMI, Mitsunori c/o KURARAY CO., LTD., 4342, Tsurumi Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Takayuki c/o KURARAY CO., LTD., 4342, Tsurumi Bizen-shi, Okayama 705-0025 / JP | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18897825.8 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018JP46066 | Priority number, date | JP20170252394 | 27.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017252394 | [2020/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131208 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733601 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/30, B01J20/20, C01B32/336, C01B32/342, C01B32/354 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
C01B32/354 (EP);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01D15/00 (US);
B01J20/28076 (US);
B01J20/28085 (US);
B01J20/3078 (US);
C01B32/30 (EP);
C01B32/318 (US);
C01B32/336 (EP);
C01B32/342 (EP);
C01B32/348 (US);
C02F1/283 (US);
C01P2006/14 (US);
C01P2006/16 (US);
C01P2006/22 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | C01B32/30, B01J20/20, C01B32/336, C01B32/342 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | AKTIVKOHLE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/45] | English: | ACTIVATED CARBON AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2020/45] | French: | CHARBON ACTIF ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2020 | Translation filed | 25.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 21.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2960206 (OSAKA GAS CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * claims 2, 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0011] , [ 0031] - [0046] * * examples 1, 2 * * table 2 *; | [X]WO2017146044 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0022] - [0027] - [ 0049] * * figures 1-3 *; | EP3421425 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP]) [ ] * figures 1-3 ** paragraphs [0009] , [ 0022] - [0027] * | International search | [Y]JP2001226110 (HIRAI YOJI) [Y] 4-7 * , paragraph [0018] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010520806 (BLÜCHER GMBH) [Y] 4-7 * , paragraph [0046] & US 2012/0172216 A1, paragraph [0056] & WO 2008/110233 A1 & DE 102007050971 A1 & KR 10-2009-0118063 A & CN 101668587 A *; | [Y]JP2016030697 (KANSAI COKE & CHEMICALS) [Y] 6, 7* , claims, paragraphs [0031], [0038], [0047] & US 2017/0209848 A1, claims, paragraphs [0043], [0050], [0059], table 1 & WO 2016/013619 A1 & CN 106573781 A & KR 10-2017-0035907 A *; | [XY]WO2017146044 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0009], [0022]-[0027], [0049], [0073], fig. 1, 2 & CN 108698833 A * [Y] 4-7; | [Y]JP2017171538 (KANSAI COKE & CHEMICALS, et al) [Y] 6, 7 * , claims, paragraphs [0038], [0040], table 1 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2006015334 | JP2006104002 |