EP3754643 - SHIFT REGISTER, GATE DRIVE CIRCUIT, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND DRIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Hefei Xinsheng Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd Xinzhan Industrial Park Hefei Anhui 230012 / CN | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Xuehuan No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yongqian No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Zumstein, Angela, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18899018.8 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/52] | WO2018CN122799 | Priority number, date | CN201810153520 | 14.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810153520 | [2020/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019157861 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754643 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3266, G11C19/28 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G09G3/3266 (EP,US);
G11C19/28 (EP);
G09G2310/0286 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0289 (EP);
G09G2310/0291 (EP);
G09G2320/029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | SCHIEBEREGISTER, GATE-ANSTEUERUNGSKREIS, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/52] | English: | SHIFT REGISTER, GATE DRIVE CIRCUIT, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND DRIVING METHOD | [2020/52] | French: | REGISTRE À DÉCALAGE, CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE DE GRILLE, PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTAQUE | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2019 | Translation filed | 16.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]KR20170078978 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2017285375 (IWASE YASUAKI [JP], et al) |