EP3579096 - CONSUMABLE CHIP, CONSUMABLE ITEM, AND CONSUMABLE ITEM COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Chipjet Technology Co., Ltd. Room 421, 4th Floor, Building 1 No. 1180 Bin'an Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310012 / CN | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Zhiye Room 421, 4th Floor, Building 1 No. 1180 Bin'an Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310012 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhengdong Room 421, 4th Floor, Building 1 No. 1180 Bin'an Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310012 / CN | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio, et al Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18899026.1 | 10.08.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018CN99773 | Priority number, date | CN201810318484 | 11.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810318484 | [2019/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019196284 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579096 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, G06F21/44, G06F21/60, G06F21/79 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
B41J2/17546 (EP);
G06F3/1219 (CN);
G06F3/1222 (CN,US);
B41J29/393 (EP);
G06F21/44 (EP);
G06F21/608 (EP);
G06F3/1203 (EP);
G06F3/1229 (EP,US);
G06F3/1238 (CN,US);
G06F3/1239 (EP,US);
G06F3/1279 (EP);
G06F3/1285 (CN);
B41J2029/3937 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | VERBRAUCHSCHIP, VERBRAUCHSARTIKEL UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR VERBRAUCHSARTIKEL | [2019/50] | English: | CONSUMABLE CHIP, CONSUMABLE ITEM, AND CONSUMABLE ITEM COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2019/50] | French: | PUCE CONSOMMABLE, ARTICLE CONSOMMABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION D'ARTICLE CONSOMMABLE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2019 | Translation filed | 18.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.02.2022 | 14.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/34] | 15.04.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2854063 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0118] - [0133] * [I] 2,3,8,9; | [I]WO2009145773 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 3 * * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line 23 * | International search | [A]CN107203359 (HANGZHOU CHIPJET TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]CN104057730 (ZHUHAI APEX MICROELECTRONICS) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]CN102231054 (ZHUHAI PRINT RITE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * entire document * |