Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11191804 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2021 | B2 | US2020330549 | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 | WO2018JP48523 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102510514B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | B1 | KR20200096603 | 12.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 | WO2018JP48523 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7195621B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2022 | B2 | JPWO2019138944 | 04.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 | WO2018JP48523 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111556758B | Global Dossier | 29.12.2023 | B | CN111556758 | 18.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 | WO2018JP48523 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3087744 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 | WO2018JP48523 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018402356B | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | B2 | AU2018402356 | 30.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 | WO2018JP48523 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3738602 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2023 | B1 | EP3738602 | 13.10.2021 | A4 | EP3738602 | 18.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 | WO2018JP48523 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202006539R | 28.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 | WO2018JP48523 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019138944 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018001063 | 09.01.2018 |