EP3738602 - CYTOCIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujita Academy 1-98 Dengakugakubo Kutsukake-cho Toyoake-shi, Aichi 470-1192 / JP | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIHARA Kazuhiro c/o Fujita Health University, FUJITA ACADEMY, 1- 98, Dengakugakubo, Kutsukake-cho Toyoake-shi, Aichi 470-1192 / JP | 02 /
KANAYAMA Naohiro c/o National University Corporation Hamamatsu University School of Medicine, 20-1, Handayama 1- chome, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | 03 /
SHIBATA Toshiaki c/o National University Corporation Hamamatsu University School of Medicine, 20-1, Handayama 1- chome, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | 04 /
ONODERA Yuichiro c/o National University Corporation Hamamatsu University School of Medicine, 20-1, Handayama 1- chome, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 18899050.1 | 28.12.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018JP48523 | Priority number, date | JP20180001063 | 09.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018001063 | [2020/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138944 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738602 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3738602 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/10, A61K47/64, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07K7/08 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,KR);
A61K38/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYTOZID | [2020/47] | English: | CYTOCIDE | [2020/47] | French: | CYTOCIDE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2020 | Translation filed | 09.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | IT | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2016145308 (FUKUDA MICHIKO [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * , claims, [0011]-[0012], [0051], [0140], [0215], [0262]-[0263], Figs. 4, 6, 8 & WO 2014/201118 A2 *; | [A] - SUGIHARA, K. et al., "Development of pro-apoptotic peptides as potential therapy for peritoneal endometriosis", Nat. Commun., (20140000), vol. 5, no. 4478, pages 1 - 9, XP055255332 [A] 1-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5478 | [A] - SUGIHARA, Kazuhiro, "Peptide drug discovery", Journal of Japan Society of Endometriosis, JP, (2015), vol. 36, pages 38 - 40, XP009521685 [A] 1-5 | by applicant | US2016145308 | JP2018001063 | - SUGIHARA et al., NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20140000), vol. 5 |