EP3734283 - APPLICATIONS OF BIOMARKER IN TERMS OF DETERMINING ANTIPHOSPHOLIPID SYNDROME AND REAGENT KIT OF BIOMARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGZHOU KANGRUN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO., LTD Room 601A, Buliding 2, No. 8, Dengyun Road Tangbudong Village, Nancun Town, Panyu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 511442 / CN | [2023/24] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states GUANGZHOU KANGRUN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO., LTD Room 601A, Buliding 2, No. 8, Dengyun Road Tangbudong Village, Nancun Town, Panyu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 511442 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Chengde Room 601A, Buliding 2, No. 8, Dengyun Road Tangbudong Village, Nancun Town, Panyu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 511442 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Hui Room 601A, Buliding 2, No. 8, Dengyun Road Tangbudong Village, Nancun Town, Panyu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 511442 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Wenxi Room 601A, Buliding 2, No. 8, Dengyun Road Tangbudong Village, Nancun Town, Panyu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 511442 / CN | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Monteiro Alves, Inês Alameda Dos Oceanos, Nº 41K-21 Parque das Nações 1990-207 Lisboa / PT | [2023/24] |
Former [2020/45] | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18899192.1 | 10.07.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018CN95067 | Priority number, date | CN20181030852 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810030852 | [2020/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019136948 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734283 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3734283 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/48, G01N33/53, G01N21/76, G01N33/564 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/564 (EP);
G01N33/6854 (CN,US);
G01N33/6893 (CN,US);
G01N21/76 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/48 (CN);
G01N33/53 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | G01N33/68, G01N33/48, G01N33/53, G01N21/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGEN VON BIOMARKERN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES ANTIPHOSPHOLIPID-SYNDROMS UND REAGENZIENKIT FÜR BIOMARKER | [2020/45] | English: | APPLICATIONS OF BIOMARKER IN TERMS OF DETERMINING ANTIPHOSPHOLIPID SYNDROME AND REAGENT KIT OF BIOMARKER | [2020/45] | French: | APPLICATIONS D'UN BIOMARQUEUR PAR RAPPORT À LA DÉTERMINATION DU SYNDROME DES ANTIPHOSPHOLIPIDES ET KIT DE RÉACTIFS DE BIOMARQUEUR | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2020 | Translation filed | 31.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | IE | 10.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5998223 (MATSUURA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005054853 (GLYCOMINDS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010261194 (YU GUO-LIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]WO2010121714 (DIAMETRA S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011022780 (SOUTH EASTERN SYDNEY AND ILLAWARRA AREA HEALTH SERVICE [AU], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013006156 (INOVA DIAGNOSTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * whole document, in particular claim 1; par. 54 *; | [Y]WO2017194779 (SERVIZO GALEGO DE SAÚDE (SERGAS) [ES], et al) [Y] 1-6 * whole document, in particular p.13, l. 15-33, p. 14, l. 11, p. 15, l. 10 *; | [Y] - MALIN ?STENSSON ET AL, "A Possible Mechanism behind Autoimmune Disorders Discovered By Genome-Wide Linkage and Association Analysis in Celiac Disease", PLOS ONE, (20130802), vol. 8, no. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0070174, page e70174, XP055343972 [Y] 1-6 * whole document, in particular p. 5, col. 2, full par. 5; p. 9, col. 2, full par. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0070174 | International search | [A]CN206489172U (TIANJIN BAIAISEN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [PX]CN108226534 (GUANGZHOU KANGRUN BIOLOGICAL TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10; | [X] - HAN Haibo et al., "Preparation and identification of mouse anti-human myosin va polyclonal antibody", Chinese Journal of Cellular and Molecular Immunology, (20050518), vol. 25, no. 5, doi:10.13423/j.cnki.cjcmi.005016, ISSN 1007-8738, pages 451 - 453, XP009522459 [X] 7-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.13423/j.cnki.cjcmi.005016 | [A] - Venkaiah Betapudi , George Lominadze , Linda Hsi , Belinda Willard , Meifang Wu , Keith R McCrae, "Anti-beta 2GPI antibodies stimulate endothelial cell mi-croparticle release via a non-muscle myosin II motor protein-dependent pathway", Blood, (20130828), vol. 122, no. 23, doi:10.1182/blood-2013-03-490318, pages 3808 - 3817, XP055625069 [A] 1-10 * , * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2013-03- | Examination | WO2017122203 | - YAMAZAKI REIJI ET AL, "Expression of Unconventional Myosin VI in Oligodendrocytes", NEUROCHEMICAL RESEARCH, PLENUM PRESS, NEW YORK, US, vol. 42, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S11064-017-2377-7, ISSN 0364-3190, (20170821), pages 3372 - 3381, (20170821), XP036365055 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11064-017-2377-7 |