EP3739779 - INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL, AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states China Academy of Telecommunications Technology No.40 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing, 100191 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Xuejuan No.40 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | 02 /
EKPENYONG, Tony No.40 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18899254.9 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018CN122003 | Priority number, date | CN20181032643 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810032643 | [2020/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137168 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739779 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04L1/16, H04J13/00 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
H04J13/0074 (EP);
H04W72/21 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (CN,KR);
H04L1/00 (EP);
H04L1/0041 (EP);
H04L1/0073 (EP);
H04L1/1607 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1671 (EP);
H04L1/1692 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR);
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W72/54 (EP);
H04W72/542 (CN,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2020/47] | English: | INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL, AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS, TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | Translation filed | 10.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 26.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3684125 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); |