EP3739552 - FACIAL RECOGNITION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCHI, Taketo c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Kenji c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 18899922.1 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018JP47063 | Priority number, date | JP20180003229 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018003229 | [2020/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138838 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739552 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, E05B49/00, G07B15/00, G07C9/10, G07C9/37 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
G07C9/37 (EP);
G06V40/165 (US);
G06T7/0014 (US);
G06V20/52 (EP);
G06V40/172 (EP);
G07C9/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | G07C9/00, E05B49/00, G07B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | GESICHTSERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/47] | English: | FACIAL RECOGNITION DEVICE | [2020/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE FACIALE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2020 | Translation filed | 12.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 09.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009189984 (YAMAZAKI RYUJI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 7,8 ** paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] *; | [I]JP2010003009 (TOSHIBA CORP) [I] 1,11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2010045424 (KAWAKITA HIJIRI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0092] * * figures 1-11 *; | [I]EP2558977 (IEE SARL [LU]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 1-6 *; | [XI]EP2704107 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES LTD [IE]) [X] 1,11,15 * abstract * * page 1; figures 1-7, 24 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0077] * * claims 1-7 * [I] 1-15 | International search | [A]JP2009108555 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-21* , paragraphs [0013], [0017], [0020]-[0026], [0031], [0032], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2007156541 | JP2009003659 | JP2018003229 |