Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11297225 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2021092285 | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810023876 | 10.01.2018 | WO2018CN121969 | 19.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3699868 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2021 | A4 | EP3699868 | 26.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810023876 | 10.01.2018 | WO2018CN121969 | 19.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019137166 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810023876 | 10.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110033502B | Global Dossier | 13.11.2020 | B | CN110033502 | 19.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201810023876 | 10.01.2018 |