EP3699868 - VIDEO PRODUCING METHOD, APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yan No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yaoyong No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 18900093.8 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018CN121969 | Priority number, date | CN20181023876 | 10.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810023876 | [2020/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137166 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3699868 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T13/00, G11B27/031, G11B27/34, H04N5/262, G06T13/80 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G11B27/031 (EP);
G06F16/7867 (CN);
H04N23/64 (EP,US);
G06T13/00 (CN);
G11B27/34 (EP);
H04N23/617 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | G06T13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | VIDEOERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2020/35] | English: | VIDEO PRODUCING METHOD, APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION VIDÉO, APPAREIL, SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2020 | Translation filed | 20.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010220197 (DUKELLIS JOHN NICHOLAS [US], et al); | [A]US2011311198 (TABE KENICHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP2940688 (SONY CORP [JP]) |