EP3740045 - ACTIVE GAS GENERATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/47] | ACTIVE GAS GENERATION DEVICE | ||
[2022/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1, Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Kensuke c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Shinichi c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | 03 /
ARITA, Ren c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Yoshihito c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | 05 /
TABATA, Yoichiro c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [2022/39] |
Former [2020/47] | 01 /
WATANABE, Kensuke c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION, 3-1-1 Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIMURA, Shinichi c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION, 3-1-1 Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | |||
03 /
ARITA, Ren c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION, 3-1-1 Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMADA, Yoshihito c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION, 3-1-1 Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | |||
05 /
TABATA, Yoichiro c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION, 3-1-1 Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 18900159.7 | 10.01.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018JP00254 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138456 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740045 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3740045 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/24, B01J19/08, C23C16/452, C23C16/455, C23C16/50, H05H1/30 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
H05H1/2406 (EP,US);
H05H1/2418 (KR);
H01J37/32568 (KR,US);
B01J12/002 (EP,KR);
B01J19/088 (EP,KR);
C23C14/0026 (EP,KR);
C23C16/452 (KR,US);
C23C16/455 (KR,US);
C23C16/50 (KR,US);
H01J37/32082 (US);
H01J37/32348 (KR,US);
H01J37/3244 (KR,US);
H05H1/30 (KR);
B01J2219/0809 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/0815 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVGASERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/47] | English: | ACTIVE GAS GENERATION APPARATUS | [2022/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE GAZ ACTIF | [2020/47] |
Former [2020/47] | ACTIVE GAS GENERATION DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2020 | Translation filed | 18.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 14.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | GB | 10.01.2023 | IE | 10.01.2023 | LU | 10.01.2023 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
GB | 10.01.2023 | ||
IE | 10.01.2023 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
GB | 10.01.2023 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
GB | 10.01.2023 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
GB | 10.01.2023 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008123142 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO2008132901 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-8 ** paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0068] *; | [A]JP2010108665 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0050] *; | [A]KR20150015689 (CHOI H S; LEE H R; PARK S S; YOO J H) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]WO2017203674 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0188] * * figures 1-12 * | International search | [A]WO2008123142 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , & KR 10-2009-0108738 A & CN 101658076 A & TW 200904262 A *; | [A]WO2008132901 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , *; | [A]WO2009028084 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELEC INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , & US 2010/0193129 Al, & KR 10-2010-0039887 A & CN 101765902 A *; | [A]WO2009069204 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELEC INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , *; | [A]JP2011011183 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC IND SYSTEM CORP, et al)[A] 1-4 | by applicant | JPS5328685B | JP5694543B |